Original Case: 3:17-cv-03301

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:17-cv-16783
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Case Filed:Sep 06, 2017
Last checked: Friday Sep 08, 2017 1:25 AM PDT
Defendant - Appellant
LINKEDIN CORPORATION
Represented By
Rosemarie T. Ring
Munger Tolles & Olson, LLP
contact info
Donald Beaton Verrilli Jr.
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Jonathan H. Blavin
Munger Tolles & Olson, LLP
contact info
Chad Golder
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Nicholas Fram
Munger Tolles & Olson, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
HIQ LABS, INC.
Represented By
Deepak Gupta
Farella Braun & Martel LLP
contact info
Rebecca H. Stephens
Farella Braun & Martel LLP
contact info
Carl Brandon Wisoff
Farella Braun & Martel LLP
contact info

Docket last updated: 01/03/2018 2:34 PM PST
Wednesday, September 06, 2017
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: To be set. Preliminary Injunction, C.R. 3-3 [10570561] (JBS) [Entered: 09/06/2017 11:15 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Docketing Letter
Att: 2 2 pgs Mediation Letter
Att: 3 2 pgs Mediation Questionnaire
Att: 4 9 pgs Case Opening Packet
2 2 2 pgs Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: ME): The appeal filed September 5, 2017 is a preliminary injunction appeal. Accordingly, Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 shall apply. The mediation questionnaire is due three days after the date of this order. If they have not already done so, within 7 calendar days after the filing date of this order, the parties shall make arrangements to obtain from the court reporter an official transcript of proceedings in the district court that will be included in the record on appeal. The briefing schedule shall proceed as follows: the opening brief and excerpts of record are due not later than October 3, 2017; the answering brief is due October 31, 2017 or 28 days after service of the opening brief, whichever is earlier; and the optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. See 9th Cir. R. 3-3(b). The parties are reminded that streamlined requests for extensions of time are not available in preliminary injunction appeals. See http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/content/view.php?pk_id=0000000638. Any request for an extension of time must be requested under Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(b). Failure to file timely the opening brief shall result in the automatic dismissal of this appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. [10571779] (ME) [Entered: 09/06/2017 05:11 PM]
Related: [-]