Seadrill Limited and Seadrill Management Ltd.
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David R Jones |
Case #: | 6:17-bk-60079 |
Case Filed: | Sep 12, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 30, 2021 |
Plan Confirmed: | Apr 17, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
# of Creditors | 10,001-25,000 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,000,001 to $50 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,000,001 to $50 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Seadrill Limited
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Eastern Drilling AS
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
North Atlantic Alpha, Ltd.
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
North Atlantic Crew AS
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
North Atlantic Crewing Ltd.
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
North Atlantic Drilling Ltd.
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
North Atlantic Drilling UK Ltd
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
North Atlantic Elara, Ltd.
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
North Atlantic Epsilon Ltd.
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
North Atlantic Linus Charterer Ltd.
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
North Atlantic Management AS
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
North Atlantic Navigator Ltd.
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
North Atlantic Norway Ltd.
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
North Atlantic Phoenix Ltd.
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
North Atlantic Support Services Limited
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
North Atlantic Venture Ltd.
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Scorpion Drilling Ltd.
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Scorpion Intrepid Ltd.
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Scorpion Servicos Offshore Ltda
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Scorpion Vigilant Ltd.
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Sea Dragon de Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V.
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Seadrill Abu Dhabi Operations Limited
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Seadrill Americas, Inc.
11210 Equity Drive Suite 150
Houston, TX 77041 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Seadrill Angola, Lda
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Seadrill Aquila Ltd.
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Seadrill Ariel Ltd.
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Seadrill Brunei Ltd.
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Seadrill Callisto Ltd
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Seadrill Capital Spares Pool AS
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Seadrill Carina Ltd.
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Seadrill Castor Ltd.
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Seadrill Castor Pte. Ltd
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Seadrill Cressida Ltd
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Seadrill Deepwater Charterer Ltd.
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Seadrill Deepwater Crewing Ltd.
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Seadrill Deepwater Units Pte. Ltd
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Seadrill Dorado Ltd
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Seadrill Draco Ltd.
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Seadrill Eclipse Ltd.
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Seadrill Eminence Ltd
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Seadrill Far East Limited
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Seadrill Freedom Ltd.
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Seadrill GCC Operations Ltd.
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Seadrill Gemini Ltd
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Seadrill Global Services Ltd
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Seadrill Gulf Operations Neptune LLC
11210 Equity Drive Suite 150
Houston, TX 77041 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Seadrill Indonesia Ltd.
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Seadrill International Resourcing DMCC
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Seadrill Jack Up Holding Ltd
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Seadrill Jack Up I B.V.
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Seadrill Jack Up II B.V.
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Seadrill Jupiter Ltd
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Seadrill Labuan Ltd
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Seadrill Libra Ltd.
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Seadrill Management (S) Pte. Ltd.
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Seadrill Management AME Ltd
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Seadrill Management Ltd.
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Seadrill Neptune Hungary Kft.
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Seadrill Newfoundland Operations Ltd.
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Seadrill Nigeria Operations Limited
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Seadrill Offshore AS
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Seadrill Offshore Malaysia Sdn. Bhd.
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Seadrill Offshore Nigeria Limited
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Seadrill Operations de Mexico, S. de R.L. de C.V.
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Seadrill Orion Ltd
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Seadrill Pegasus (S) Pte. Ltd.
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Seadrill Prospero Ltd.
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Seadrill Saturn Ltd
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Seadrill Servicos de Petroleo Ltda
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Seadrill Telesto Ltd.
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Seadrill Tellus Ltd.
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Seadrill Tucana Ltd
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Seadrill UK Ltd
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Sevan Brasil Ltd.
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Sevan Driller Ltd.
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Sevan Drilling Limited (UK)
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Sevan Drilling North America LLC
11025 Equity Drive Suite 150
Houston, TX 77041 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Sevan Drilling Pte. Ltd
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Sevan Drilling Rig II AS
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Sevan Drilling Rig II Pte. Ltd.
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Sevan Drilling Rig V AS
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Sevan Drilling Rig V Pte. Ltd
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Sevan Drilling Rig VI AS
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Sevan Louisiana Hungary Kft.
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Sevan Marine Servicos de Perfuracao Ltda
, |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Sevan Drilling Limited (Bermuda)
, |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Friday Jan 18, 2019 12:21 PM CST |
Accountant
Ernst & Young LLP
|
Represented By
|
Attorney
Haynes and Boone, LLP
|
|
Attorney
Jackson Walker L.L.P.
1401 McKinney, Suite 1900
Houston, TX 77010 |
Represented By
|
Attorney
Kirkland & Ellis LLP and Kirkland & Ellis International LLP
300 North LaSalle
Chicago, IL 60654 |
Represented By
|
Attorney
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP
Jackson Walker L.L.P. 1401 McKinney St., Suite 1900
Houston, TX 77010 |
Represented By
|
Attorney
Slaughter & May
|
Represented By
|
Auditor
PricewaterhouseCoopers Dubai
|
Represented By
|
Auditor
PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP
|
Represented By
|
Consultant
KPMG, LLP
811 Main St
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ad Hoc Group of Unsecured Noteholders
180 Maiden Lane
New York, NY 10038 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Attestor Value Master Fund LP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Banc of America Leasing & Capital, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Bank of America, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Computershare Trust Company of Canada
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Computershare Trust Company, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cowell & Lee Asia Credit Opportunities Fund
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cypress-Fairbanks ISD
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o John P. Dillman PO BOX 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Daewoo Shipbuilding & Marine Engineering
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
De Lage Landen Leasing Limited
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas as Trustee
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Dril-Quip, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Emery 68, L.L.C.
P.O. Box 748
New York, NY 10150 |
|
Creditor
Terry Gantt
3027 Ridgelake Drive
Metairie, LA 70002 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Harris County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o John Dillman PO Bx 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Hemen Holding Limited
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
JSL International, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Louisiana Machinery Company, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Mose Ondre Morace
2700 Post Oak Blvd., Ste. 112
Houston, TX 77056 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
National Oilwell Varco
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Donald G. Nelson
240 Brattle Road
Syracuse, NY 13203 |
|
Creditor
Phong Nguyen
4118 Lakeshore Forest Drive
Missouri City, TX 77459 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Elwood T Olsen
5220 S Blackstone Ave Apt 3
Chicago, IL 60615 |
|
Creditor
Eddie Ratliff
3027 Ridgelake Dr
Metairie, LA 70002 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Richey Road Municipal Utility District
1235 North Loop West, Suite 600
Houston, TX 77008 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
RigNet, Inc.
440 Louisiana, Suite 718
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Samsung Heavy Industries Co., Ltd.
875 Third Avenue
New York, NY 10022 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Anthony Skinner
P. O. Box 79
Waialua, HI 96791 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Sodexo, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Sound Point Beacon Master Fund, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Peter Spuler, Jr
10800 Blackpowder Court
Fort Washington, MD 20744 |
|
Creditor
TLC SA Transportation and Logistic Consulting
P.O. Box 6542
Houston, TX 77265 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Transocean, Inc. and Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
UnitedLex Limited
Spencer Fane LLP Attn: Jacob Sparks 5800 Granite Parkway Suite 800
Plano, TX 75024 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Tongyi Wang
|
|
Creditor Committee
The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
|
Represented By
|
Examiner
Charles A Beckham, Jr
Haynes and Boone, LLP 1221 McKinney Street Suite 2100
Houston, TX 77010 |
Represented By
|
Financial Advisor
Alvarez & Marsal North America, LLC
2100 Ross Ave, 21st Floor
Dallas, TX 75201 |
Represented By
|
Financial Advisor
Baker Tilly Virchow Krause LLP
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Jon Magne Asmyr
|
|
Interested Party
Kathleen M Beuse
4765 Montebello Dr
Colorado Springs, CO 80918 |
|
Interested Party
Ben Buongiorno
8606 La Fonte St
Houston, TX 77024 |
|
Interested Party
Centerbridge Credit Partners, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Conflicts Committee of Seadrill Partners LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Conflicts Committee of the Board of Directors of North Atlantic Drilling Limited
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Conflicts Committee of the Board of Directors of Sevan Drilling Limited
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Coordinating Committee of Senior Secured Credit Facility Agents, Lenders and Export Credit Agencies
Attn: Timothy A. ("Tad") Davidson II 600 Travis, Suite 4200
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Gerald Cornelius
|
|
Interested Party
DXC Technology Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Angela and Juan Dios
1117 Gerald St
Uniondale, NY 11553 |
|
Interested Party
Jurong Shipyard Pte Ltd
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Jurong Shipyard Pte Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Kelvin Kan
|
|
Interested Party
Arthur Lehmann
2152 Park Dr.
Arnold, MO 63010 |
|
Interested Party
Charles R Marr
290 Bamert Rd.
Las Cruces, NM 88007 |
|
Interested Party
Elwood T Olsen
5220 S Blackstone Ave Apt 3
Chicago, IL 60615 |
|
Interested Party
Jeevraj O. Oswal
|
|
Interested Party
Gary J. Rose
|
|
Interested Party
John Roufs
117 1st St NE
Little Falls, MN 56345 |
|
Interested Party
Select Commitment Parties
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP 1700 Pacific Avenue Suite 4100
Dallas, TX 75201 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Sembmarine SSP Inc
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Victoria Tabin
4024 Schillinger Drive
Naperville, IL 60564 |
|
Interested Party
Jerry Vanee
|
|
Other Prof.
Prime Clerk LLC
|
|
Spec. Counsel
Advokatfirmaet Thommessen AS
|
Represented By
|
Spec. Counsel
Conyers Dill & Pearman Limited
|
Represented By
|
Spec. Counsel
Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP
787 7th Ave
New York, NY 10019 |
Represented By
|
Transferee
Barclays Bank PLC
700 Prides Crossing
Newark, DE 19713 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
GPO
Dec 19 2019
Memorandum Opinion Signed on 12/19/2019 (Related document(s):1630 Generic Motion, 1635 Generic Motion) (VrianaPortillo) |
1. | Seadrill Files for Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Protection in Texas (wsj.com) |
Submitted Thu 09/14/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 4 minutes ago |
Monday, January 22, 2024 | ||
1825 | 1825
trustee
Remark (batch)
Mon 01/22 2:03 PM
Remark: Judge Marvin Isgur randomly reassigned and added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated . (DawnaKelly) |