BASS et al v. TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Claire C Cecchi |
Referred: | Leda D Wettre |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-07019 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Sep 12, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Mar 11, 2018 5:41 AM EDT |
Defendant
TAKEDA CALIFORNIA, INC.
|
|
Defendant
TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER INC.
|
|
Defendant
TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED
|
|
Defendant
TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS LLC
|
|
Defendant
TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC.
|
|
Defendant
TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC.
|
|
In Re
PROTON-PUMP INHIBITOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (No. II)
|
|
Notice Only
JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION
CLERK OF THE PANEL ONE COLUMBUS CIRCLE, NE THURGOOD MARSHALL FEDERAL JUDICIARY BUIDLING ROOM G-255 - NORTH LOBBY
WASHINGTON, DC 20002 |
|
Plaintiff
JIMMY BASS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MARGARETE BASS
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
40 | 40
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 04/01 5:47 PM
NOTICE by MARGARETE BASS of Adoption of PSC's Reply Memo in Support of Plaintiffs' Daubert Motion to Exclude Dr. Steven G. Coca (KRAFT, KRISTINE) |
|
39 | 39
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 04/01 5:46 PM
NOTICE by MARGARETE BASS of Adoption of PSC's Reply Memo in Support of Plaintiffs' Daubert Motion to Exclude Dr. Aaron Winn (KRAFT, KRISTINE) |
|
38 | 38
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Mon 04/01 3:51 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion filed by TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC. re22 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Gilbert Moeckel DEFENDANTS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF DR. GILBERT MOECKEL(MIZGALA, JAMES) |
|
Att: 1 Certification of James Mizgala, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E | ||
37 | 37
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Mon 04/01 12:44 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion filed by TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC. re21 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony of Martin Wells, Ph.D. DEFENDANTS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF MARTIN WELLS, PH.D.(MIZGALA, JAMES) |
|
Att: 1 Certification of James Mizgala, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit F | ||
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
misc
Certification
Mon 03/25 11:10 PM
Certification of Kristine K. Kraft on behalf of MARGARETE BASS Re25 Motion for Summary Judgment,,.(KRAFT, KRISTINE) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Bass Depo Transcript, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Jensen Depo Transcript, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Dr Mahoubi Rept, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Dr. Mahoubi Depo, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Dr. Ross Rept, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Dr. Ross Supp Rept., | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Dr. Gerstman Rept, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H - Dr. Mahal Rept, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I - Dr. SIlberzweig Rept, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit J - Dexilant 5.2012 Label, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit K - Dexilant - 7.2023 Label, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit L - Dr. Lafayette Rept, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit M - Walgreens Record | ||
35 | 35
respm
Statement of Material Facts in Opposition to Motion
Mon 03/25 11:02 PM
STATEMENT of Material Facts in Opposition filed by MARGARETE BASS re25 MOTION for Summary Judgment (KRAFT, KRISTINE) |
|
34 | 34
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 03/25 11:01 PM
RESPONSE to Motion filed by MARGARETE BASS re25 MOTION for Summary Judgment Statement of Facts (KRAFT, KRISTINE) |
|
33 | 33
30+
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Opposition of Motion
Mon 03/25 10:59 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by MARGARETE BASS re25 MOTION for Summary Judgment (KRAFT, KRISTINE) |
|
32 | 32
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 03/25 6:24 PM
NOTICE by MARGARETE BASS of Adoption of PSC's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment with Associated Pleadings and Exhibits (KRAFT, KRISTINE) |
|
Monday, March 04, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 03/04 5:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SHERRY A. KNUTSON on behalf of TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC. (KNUTSON, SHERRY) |
|
30 | 30
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 03/04 4:52 PM
NOTICE by TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC. of Adoption of Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Daubert Motion to Exclude General Causation Opinions of Steven Coca, DO, MS (MIZGALA, JAMES) |
|
29 | 29
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 03/04 4:00 PM
NOTICE by MARGARETE BASS of Adoption of PSC's Memo in Opposition to Takeda Defendants' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Gilbert Moeckel (KRAFT, KRISTINE) |
|
28 | 28
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 03/04 3:57 PM
NOTICE by MARGARETE BASS of Adoption of PSC's Memo in Support of Its Opposition to the Takeda Defendants' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Martin Wells, PH.D. (KRAFT, KRISTINE) |
|
27 | 27
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 03/04 3:46 PM
NOTICE by TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC. of Adoption of Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs Daubert Motion to Exclude General Causation Opinions of Aaron N. Winn, Ph.D. (Rose, Jason) |
|
Tuesday, February 20, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Partial Summary Judgment
Tue 02/20 12:01 PM
MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Preemption Grounds by TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC.. Responses due by 3/25/2024.(Stuart, William) |
|
Att: 1 Brief in support of Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Preemption Grounds, | ||
Att: 2 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, | ||
Att: 3 Certification of William R. Stuart III, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit K, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit L, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit M, | ||
Att: 16 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, February 16, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Summary Judgment
Fri 02/16 11:56 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC.. Responses due by 3/25/2024.(GLINKA PRZYBYSZ, ANDREA) |
|
Att: 1 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment, | ||
Att: 2 Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, | ||
Att: 3 Certification of Andrea M. Glinka Przybysz, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 10 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, January 22, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 01/22 6:32 PM
NOTICE by MARGARETE BASS of Adoption of PSC's Memo in Support of Plaintiffs' Daubert Motion to Exclude Dr. Aaron Winn (KRAFT, KRISTINE) |
|
23 | 23
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 01/22 6:00 PM
NOTICE by MARGARETE BASS of Adoption of PSC's Memo in Support of Plaintiffs' Daubert Motion to Exclude Dr. Steven G. Coca (KRAFT, KRISTINE) |
|
22 | 22
motion
In Limine
Mon 01/22 1:19 PM
MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Gilbert Moeckel by TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC..(Stuart, William) |
|
Att: 1 Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Certification, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 8 Text of Proposed Order | ||
21 | 21
motion
In Limine
Mon 01/22 12:30 PM
MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony of Martin Wells, Ph.D. by TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC..(Stuart, William) |
|
Att: 1 Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Certification, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 7 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, June 21, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 06/21 10:26 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by AGGIE LEE on behalf of TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC. (LEE, AGGIE) |
|
Thursday, February 16, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 02/16 1:05 PM
SHORT FORM ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED.(ROSE, BETH) |
|
Tuesday, November 15, 2022 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 11/15 12:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by BRITTANY WEISS on behalf of TAKEDA CALIFORNIA, INC., TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS LLC, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC. (WEISS, BRITTANY) |
|
Monday, October 31, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Substitution of Attorney
Mon 10/31 3:02 PM
Substitution of Attorney - Attorney LESLIE A BENITEZ terminated. Attorney BETH S. ROSE for TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER INC.,BETH S. ROSE for TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED,BETH S. ROSE for TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC. added.. (ROSE, BETH) |
|
Tuesday, July 26, 2022 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 07/26 2:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by C. ASHLEY SAFERIGHT on behalf of TAKEDA CALIFORNIA, INC., TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS LLC, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC. (SAFERIGHT, C.) |
|
Friday, July 08, 2022 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 07/08 4:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES WILLIAM MIZGALA on behalf of TAKEDA CALIFORNIA, INC., TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS LLC, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC. (MIZGALA, JAMES) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 07/08 3:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREA MARIE GLINKA PRZYBYSZ on behalf of TAKEDA CALIFORNIA, INC., TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS LLC, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC. (GLINKA PRZYBYSZ, ANDREA) |
|
Thursday, June 30, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 06/30 3:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by KRISTINE KRAFT on behalf of JIMMY BASS, MARGARETE BASS (KRAFT, KRISTINE) |
|
Thursday, September 30, 2021 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 09/30 2:51 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Magistrate Judge Mark Falk no longer assigned to the case. (wh) |
||
Monday, September 27, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Substitution of Attorney
Mon 09/27 12:56 PM
Substitution of Attorney - Attorney JEFFREY R. LILLY terminated. Attorney LESLIE A BENITEZ for TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER INC.,LESLIE A BENITEZ for TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC. added.. (BENITEZ, LESLIE) |
|
Thursday, October 11, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
order
Stipulation and Order
Thu 10/11 11:27 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER of DISMISSAL as to NAMED DEFENDANTS ONLY. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 10/11/18. (jl, ) |
|
Wednesday, April 18, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 04/18 11:27 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by TAKEDA CALIFORNIA, INC., TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS LLC, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC..(LILLY, JEFFREY) |
|
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 12/19 11:30 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by JIMMY BASS, MARGARETE BASS. TAKEDA CALIFORNIA, INC. served on 9/21/2017, answer due 10/12/2017. (LONDON, MICHAEL) |
|
Thursday, September 28, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 09/28 5:38 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by JIMMY BASS, MARGARETE BASS. TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC. served on 9/20/2017, answer due 10/11/2017. (LONDON, MICHAEL) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 09/28 5:35 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by JIMMY BASS, MARGARETE BASS. TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC. served on 9/20/2017, answer due 10/11/2017. (LONDON, MICHAEL) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 09/28 5:34 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by JIMMY BASS, MARGARETE BASS. TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER INC. served on 9/20/2017, answer due 10/11/2017. (LONDON, MICHAEL) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 09/28 5:33 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by JIMMY BASS, MARGARETE BASS. TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS LLC served on 9/21/2017, answer due 10/12/2017. (LONDON, MICHAEL) |
|
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Wed 09/13 3:12 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to TAKEDA CALIFORNIA, INC., TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS LLC, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Donato Marucci* (dam) |
|
3 | 3
9
pgs
order
Order
Wed 09/13 8:37 AM
MDL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #2. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 8/23/17. (gh, ) |
|
2 | 2
6
pgs
order
Order
Wed 09/13 8:36 AM
MDL INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 8/15/17. (gh, ) |
|
qc
QC - Attorney Case Opening
Wed 09/13 3:13 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information updated to reflect information submitted in caption of filed complaint . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (dam) |
||
Tuesday, September 12, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 09/12 4:53 PM
COMPLAINT against TAKEDA CALIFORNIA, INC., TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS LLC, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC, Takeda Pharmaceuticals International Inc ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8084269) with JURY DEMAND, filed by JIMMY L BASS, MARGARETE E BASS.(LONDON, MICHAEL) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 09/13 8:14 AM
Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Mark Falk added. (eu, ) |