Jackson v. United States of America
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jane J Boyle |
Referred: | Renee Harris Toliver |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-02413 |
Nature of Suit | 510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence |
Cause | 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentence |
Case Filed: | Sep 12, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 12, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, September 12, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party
Tue 09/12 9:49 AM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (sss) |
|
3 | 3
qcref
Boyle
Tue 09/12 9:49 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee is not due for this case. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Toliver (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] and[LINK:circuit] indexes.) (sss) |
|
1 | 1
5
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure
Tue 09/12 9:47 AM
ORDER: Petitioner's2 motion for relief from judgment under Rule 60(b) is denied. Treated as a successive § 2255 motion, the Rule 60(b) motion is dismissed without prejudice to Petitioner seeking leave to file from the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit. The Clerk of the Court is directed to open and close for indexing purposes based on this order a new § 2255 motion to vacate sentence (nature of suit 510, assigned to the same District Judge and Magistrate Judge as this case). [Originally filed in 3:14-cv-3246-B-BK] (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 9/12/2017) (sss) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Tue 09/12 9:50 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,4. Tue Sep 12 09:50:22 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
mot2255
Motion to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255
Tue 09/12 9:48 AM
MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 [Motion for Relief from a Judgment pursuant to Rule 60(b)] (Civil and Criminal Case Number 3:14-cv-3246, 3:13-cr-31) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. [Originally filed in 3:14-cv-3246] (sss) |