Parsons Xtreme Golf LLC v. Taylor Made Golf Company Incorporated
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Dominic W Lanza |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-03125 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Sep 12, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 04, 2019 |
Last checked: Sunday Mar 11, 2018 2:36 AM MST |
Counter Claimant
Taylor Made Golf Company Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Parsons Xtreme Golf LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Taylor Made Golf Company Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Parsons Xtreme Golf LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Monday, February 04, 2019 | ||
192 | 192
1
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation Order Dismissing Case
Mon 02/04 3:10 PM
ORDER granting191 Stipulation of Dismissal. FURTHER ORDERED that all claims in the above-captioned case are dismissed with prejudice, with each party bearing its own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 2/4/2019. (RMV) |
|
Friday, February 01, 2019 | ||
191 | 191
4
pgs
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 02/01 10:49 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Taylor Made Golf Company Incorporated.(Willis, Kenneth) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order |