Galpern v. Equifax Inc. et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Beth Labson Freeman |
Referred: | Susan Van Keulen |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-05265 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Sep 12, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 08, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Mar 11, 2018 12:28 AM PST |
Defendant
Equifax Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Trusted ID, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrew Galpern
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Dec 08 2017
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO NORTHERN DISTRICT OF GEORGIA. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2017) |
1. | Lawsuit filed against Equifax over its handling of a massive data breach (sfgate.com) |
Submitted Mon 09/18/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Saturday, December 29, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Sat 12/29 5:49 PM
NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by George Ruben Morris for Joseph R. Wetzel as counsel for defendants (Morris, George) |
|
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 12/13 10:21 AM
REQUEST FOR STATUS UPDATE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/13/2017. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2017) |
|
Monday, December 11, 2017 | ||
utility
Remark
Mon 12/11 12:37 PM
Remark: Case transferred from California Northernhas been opened in Northern District of Georgiaas case 1:17-cv-05041, filed 12/11/2017. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2017) |
||
Friday, December 08, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
9
pgs
order
Order Transferring Case - - Out of District
Fri 12/08 8:31 AM
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO NORTHERN DISTRICT OF GEORGIA. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2017) |
|
Thursday, December 07, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Notice of Change In Counsel
Thu 12/07 3:29 PM
NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Scott Edward Cole (Cole, Scott) (Filed on 12/7/2017) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Mon 11/20 12:32 PM
Motion (21 ) Hearing Vacated per27 Order on Stipulation. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2017) |
||
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
3
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Fri 11/03 6:37 PM
ORDER GRANTING 25 STIPULATION EXTENDING CASE DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/3/2017. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2017) |
|
26 | 26
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 11/03 11:17 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/29/2018. Case Management Conference set for 4/05/2018 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. All other deadlines associated with the initial case management conference are adjusted accordingly. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/blf This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2017) |
|
Thursday, November 02, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Thu 11/02 10:36 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re21 MOTION to Stay OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT, MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES - Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Case Deadlines filed by Equifax Inc., Trusted ID, Inc..(Wetzel, Joseph) (Filed on 11/2/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration in Support of Stipulation to Extend Case Deadlines | ||
Tuesday, October 24, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
respm
Opposition/Response to Motion
Tue 10/24 3:04 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE filed byAndrew Galpern.(Bennett, Corey) (Filed on 10/24/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 10/10 4:17 PM
NOTICE by Equifax Inc., Trusted ID, Inc. NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF OTHER ACTION OR PROCEEDING (Wetzel, Joseph) (Filed on 10/10/2017) |
|
22 | 22
oth_sup
Declaration in Support
Tue 10/10 4:15 PM
Declaration of Joseph R. Wetzel in Support of21 MOTION to Stay OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT, MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed byEquifax Inc., Trusted ID, Inc.. (Wetzel, Joseph) (Filed on 10/10/2017) |
|
21 | 21
motion
Stay
Tue 10/10 4:13 PM
MOTION to Stay OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT, MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by Equifax Inc., Trusted ID, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/15/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 10/24/2017. Replies due by 10/31/2017.(Wetzel, Joseph) (Filed on 10/10/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
20 | 20
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Tue 10/10 1:31 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Trusted ID, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc for Trusted ID, Inc.. and CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (Wetzel, Joseph) (Filed on 10/10/2017) |
|
19 | 19
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Tue 10/10 1:28 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Equifax Inc. and CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (Wetzel, Joseph) (Filed on 10/10/2017) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 10/10 1:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Richard Wetzel (Wetzel, Joseph) (Filed on 10/10/2017) |
|
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 09/25 9:30 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew Galpern. Trusted ID, Inc. served on 9/21/2017, answer due 10/12/2017. (Cole, Scott) (Filed on 9/25/2017) |
|
16 | 16
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 09/25 9:29 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew Galpern. Equifax Inc. served on 9/21/2017, answer due 10/12/2017. (Cole, Scott) (Filed on 9/25/2017) |
|
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 09/21 5:00 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/7/2017. Case Management Conference set for 12/14/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. All other deadlines associated with the initial case management conference are adjusted accordingly. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/blf This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2017) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 09/20 2:11 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings pursuant to Related Case Order. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Hon. Lucy H. Koh no longer assigned to the case.(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 09/20 10:07 AM
ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/20/2017. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2017) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 09/15 1:07 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Teresa Denise Allen (Allen, Teresa) (Filed on 9/15/2017) |
|
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 09/13 3:12 PM
NOTICE by Andrew Galpern re: Joinder(Bennett, Corey) (Filed on 9/13/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 09/13 3:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Paul Rumberger (Rumberger, Timothy) (Filed on 9/13/2017) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 09/13 2:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Corey Benjamin Bennett (Bennett, Corey) (Filed on 9/13/2017) |
|
8 | 8
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Wed 09/13 12:10 PM
**CLERK'S NOTICE FOLLOWING CASE REASSIGNMENT TO THE HONORABLE LUCY H. KOH** Following the case reassignment to Hon. Lucy H. Koh, an Initial Case Management Conference is set for 12/13/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California. A Joint Case Management Conference Statement is due 7-days before the scheduled conference date. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). The parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Lucy H. Koh: http://cand.uscourts.gov/lhk. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2017) |
|
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 09/13 11:40 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 9/13/2017.(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
6 | 6
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Wed 09/13 10:47 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2017) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Wed 09/13 10:32 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Andrew Galpern.. (Cole, Scott) (Filed on 9/13/2017) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Wed 09/13 9:51 AM
Summons Issued as to Trusted ID, Inc.. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2017) |
|
3 | 3
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Wed 09/13 9:07 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/5/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2017) |
|
Tuesday, September 12, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Tue 09/12 12:04 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/26/2017. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2017) |
|
1 | 1
26
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 09/12 9:57 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11707168.). Filed byAndrew Galpern.(Cole, Scott) (Filed on 9/12/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |