ROMAN v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Paul A Zoss |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-07057 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Sep 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 29, 2019 |
Defendant
Party Name in Social Security Case - Unavailable
|
|
Plaintiff
Party Name in Social Security Case - Unavailable
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 29, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 05/29 3:47 PM
ORDER affirming the decision of the Commissioner. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul A. Zoss on 5/29/2019. (eh, ) |
|
17 | 17
30+
pgs
order
Opinion
Wed 05/29 3:45 PM
OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul A. Zoss on 5/29/2019. (eh, ) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Wed 05/29 3:48 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (eh, ) |
||
Friday, March 22, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
respoth
Brief
Fri 03/22 3:22 PM
BRIEF Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 9.1(FRITTS, HEATHER) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, February 08, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
respoth
Brief
Fri 02/08 9:53 AM
BRIEF ABRAHAM S. ALTER (LANGTON, JAMES) |
|
Monday, December 24, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order Reassigning Case
Mon 12/24 7:32 PM
TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Paul A. Zoss for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Jose L. Linares no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 12/21/2018. (eh, ) |
|
Friday, November 30, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order
Fri 11/30 3:03 PM
TEXT ORDER granting12 Letter request. Plaintiff's brief is due 2/4/2019. So Ordered by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 11/30/2018. (eh, ) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Letter
Fri 11/30 1:04 PM
Letter from Abraham S. Alter EXTENSION. (LANGTON, JAMES) |
|
Monday, November 05, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order
Mon 11/05 11:35 AM
TEXT ORDER: This Court's review of the docket reveals that the plaintiff's brief is overdue. Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to file said brief by Monday, December 3, 2018. A failure to abide by this Court's Order shall result in the Administrative Termination of this action without further notice. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 11/05/2018. (lr, ) |
|
Monday, August 13, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 08/13 2:33 PM
ORDER directing parties to follow submission schedule. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 8/13/2018. (eh, ) |
|
Thursday, April 19, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge SSA
Thu 04/19 3:49 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by BENIGNO GONZALEZ ROMAN.. (LANGTON, JAMES) |
|
Monday, April 16, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order Reassigning Case
Tue 04/17 4:37 PM
TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Jose L. Linares for all further proceedings. Judge Madeline Cox Arleo no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 4/16/18. (ak, ) |
|
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
misc
Proposed Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge SSA
Fri 04/06 10:51 AM
Proposed Consent to Jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge for a Social Security Appeal ISSUED to Plaintiff. Pursuant to[LINK:Standing Order 18-2] , Plaintiff may consent to have this case assigned to a Recall Magistrate Judge for the purpose of deciding his/her Social Security Appeals. If Plaintiff elects to consent to this assignment, please complete this form and return within 30 days from the issuance of this[LINK:Consent Form] . (eh, ) |
||
Friday, January 12, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Letter
Fri 01/12 9:13 AM
Letter from Commissioner Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 9.1. (FRITTS, HEATHER) |
|
Thursday, December 21, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Letter
Thu 12/21 10:19 AM
Letter from ABRAHAM S. ALTER 9.1. (LANGTON, JAMES) |
|
Monday, December 11, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Administrative Record - SSA
Mon 12/11 10:59 AM
Administrative Record Filed - Social Security.(FRITTS, HEATHER) |
|
Att: 1 Part 2, | ||
Att: 2 Part 3, | ||
Att: 3 Part 4, | ||
Att: 4 Part 5, | ||
Att: 5 Part 6, | ||
Att: 6 Part 7, | ||
Att: 7 Part 8, | ||
Att: 8 Part 9 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 12/11 10:57 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by HEATHER TASHMAN FRITTS on behalf of COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (FRITTS, HEATHER) |
|
Thursday, October 05, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 10/05 1:31 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BENIGNO GONZALEZ ROMAN (LANGTON, JAMES) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Mon 09/18 4:57 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Shea Smith* (sms) |
|
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 09/13 2:55 PM
COMPLAINT against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8086909), filed by BENIGNO GONZALEZ ROMAN.(LANGTON, JAMES) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 09/14 11:16 AM
Judge Madeline Cox Arleo added. (eu, ) |