Dudley v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Terry R Means |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00735 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Sep 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 31, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 12, 2018 3:57 AM CDT |
Defendant
Power Default Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.,
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy Michael Dudley
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Judgment
Tue 10/31 3:49 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT: In accordance with the order issued this same day and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58, all claims are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to their refiling. All costs of Court under 28 U.S.C. § 1920 shall be borne by Plaintiff. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 10/31/2017) (edm) |
|
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 10/31 3:37 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: On September 13, 2017, this case was removed to this Court from the 141st Judicial District Court, Tarrant County, Texas. On September 19, the Court ordered that, if Plaintiff desired to pursue his claims, he should file an amended complaint no later than October 20, 2017 or his claims might be dismissed. As of the date of this order, Plaintiff has failed to comply with the September 19 order. As a result, the Court concludes that Plaintiff's claims should be and hereby are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to their refiling. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry Means on 10/31/2017) (edm) |
|
Tuesday, September 19, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order Setting Deadline/Hearing
Tue 09/19 3:47 PM
ORDER REQUIRING AMENDED COMPLAINT: Plaintiff's amended complaint must be electronically filed with the clerk of the Court no later than 10/20/2017. Failure to timely comply with this order will result in appropriate sanctions, including the dismissal of Plaintiff's claims. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 9/19/2017) (bdb) |
|
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Wed 09/13 11:14 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Power Default Services, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc., Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Ocwen Financial Corporation for Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC; Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Altisource Portfolio Solutions, Inc., Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Altisource Portfolio Solutions S.A., Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Altisource Holdings S.a r.l. for Power Default Services, Inc.; Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.,. (Shiels, Nicola) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Wed 09/13 11:08 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Power Default Services, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc., Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Ocwen Financial Corporation for Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC; Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Altisource Portfolio Solutions, Inc., Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Altisource Portfolio Solutions S.A., Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Altisource Holdings S.a r.l. for Power Default Services, Inc.; Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.,. (Shiels, Nicola) |
|
3 | 3
qcref
Means
Wed 09/13 11:06 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Means. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (bdb) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Wed 09/13 11:06 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Power Default Services, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.,. (See doc1 for image) (bdb) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 09/13 10:51 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 141st Judicial District, Tarrant County, Texas, case number 141-294448-17 filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.,, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Power Default Services, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-8667579) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Shiels, Nicola) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet Ex A - Dudley Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Cover Sheet Supplement Ex B - Dudley Supplemental Civil Cover, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) C - Index, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) C-1 - Transactions list, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) C-2 - Docket sheet, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) C-3 - Original Petition, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) C-4 - Proposed TRO, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) C-5 - TRO, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit(s) C-6 - First Amended TRO, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit(s) C-7 - Defendants' Original Answer and Affirmative Defenses, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit(s) D - Defendants' Certificate of Interested Persons, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit(s) E - Dudley - Tarrant Co. Appraisal District information as of 9-12-17 - 9005 Cedar Bluffs Dr |