Suzanne Dworak-Peck v. Gary Cherniack et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | John A Kronstadt |
Referred: | Charles F Eick |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-06676 |
Nature of Suit | 443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Sep 11, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 18, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Mar 10, 2018 1:39 AM PST |
Defendant
Gary Cherniack
18926 Pacific Coast Highway
Malibu, CA 90265 |
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Suzanne Dworak-Peck
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/16/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (CV-103) - optional html form
Mon 09/18 2:38 PM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court, Santa Monica. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court, Santa Monica. (bp) |
|
9 | 9
3
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Mon 09/18 2:36 PM
ORDER REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT by Judge John A. Kronstadt. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this matter be, and hereby is, REMANDED to the Superior Court of California listed above, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bp) |
|
8 | 8
order
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Mon 09/18 2:29 PM
ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS3 by Judge John A. Kronstadt: IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is hereby: DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: This case is hereby REMANDED to state court. (bp) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Wed 09/13 3:59 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Wed 09/13 3:59 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (car) |
|
5 | 5
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Wed 09/13 3:58 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Gary Cherniack, re Notice of Interested Parties2 served on 9/11/2012. (car) |
|
4 | 4
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Wed 09/13 3:56 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Gary Cherniack, re Notice of Removal,1 served on 9/11/2017. (car) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Wed 09/13 3:51 PM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis With Declaration in Support filed by Defendant Gary Cherniack. (car) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 09/13 3:49 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Gary Cherniack (car) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 09/13 3:48 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA County of Los Angeles, case number 17SMUD00176 with Conformed copy of summons and complaint. Case assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick, filed by Defendant Gary Cherniack. (car) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |