Helfrich v. Laxalt et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Andrew P Gordon |
Referred: | Peggy A Leen |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02392 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus |
Case Filed: | Sep 11, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 17, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Friday, November 17, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Judgment
Fri 11/17 11:41 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Adam Paul Laxalt, Brian Williams, Bruce Stroud, David Gamble, James Dzurenda, Kirk Vitto against Peter Helfrich. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 11/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) |
|
4 | 4
cmp
Petition Writ of Mandamus
Fri 11/17 11:37 AM
PETITION for Writ of Mandamus by Peter Helfrich. (JM) |
|
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion/Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis ~Util - Terminate Case
Fri 11/17 11:34 AM
ORDER granting1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. FURTHER ORDERED that, the Nevada Department of Corrections shall pay to the Clerk of the United States District Court, District of Nevada, 20% of the preceding month's deposits to plaintiff's account. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/17/2017.; Case dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: NDOC - JM) |
|
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Advisory Letter Habeas only - FORM
Wed 09/13 2:51 PM
NOTICE from USDC advising case against Laxalt et al, et al., has been received and assigned case number 2:17-cv-02392-APG-PAL . (JM) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 09/13 2:50 PM
MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Peter Helfrich.(JM) |
|
Att: 1 Petition |