Urban v. Adult Protective Services
Original Case: 1:17-cv-06035
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-02821 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 895 Other Statutes - Freedom of Information Act |
Case Filed: | Sep 11, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 25, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 30, 2018 4:41 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Adult Protective Services, (APS) a subdivision of the Human Resources Administration of the city of New York, a municipal corporation, et al.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Ralph Urban
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10/30/2018 4:38 AM EDT |
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Ralph Urban, copy to pro-se appellant, FILED. [2122670] 17-2821 [Entered: 09/12/2017 03:38 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 10 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Ralph Urban, district court receipt # 465401190283, FILED.[2122678] 17-2821 [Entered: 09/12/2017 03:40 PM] | |
3 | 3 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT MEMO ENDORSED, dated 08/15/2017, RECEIVED.[2122684] 17-2821 [Entered: 09/12/2017 03:41 PM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, copy to pro-se appellant, FILED.[2122687] 17-2821 [Entered: 09/12/2017 03:42 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 3 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |