Berthelot v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | F Dennis Saylor, IV |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-11752 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Sep 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 13, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 13, 2018 5:09 AM EDT |
Defendant
U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee for Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp., CSMC Mortgage-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-6
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joan Berthelot
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 12/13 8:13 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee for Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp., CSMC Mortgage-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-6, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Fialkow, David) |
|
Friday, December 01, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 12/01 10:17 AM
Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; granting17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Plaintiff's motion for extension of time to file response to defendant's motion to dismiss is GRANTED. Response to be filed by 12/14/2017. (Pezzarossi, Lisa) |
|
Thursday, November 30, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 11/30 1:04 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ,16 MOTION for Extension of Time to November 30, 2017 to File Response/Reply as to7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Joan Berthelot.(Dion, Todd) |
|
Sunday, November 12, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Sun 11/12 9:23 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to November 30, 2017 to File Response/Reply as to7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Joan Berthelot.(Dion, Todd) |
|
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 11/03 9:31 AM
Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot12 Motion for Extension of Time to 11/2/2017 to File Response/Reply. (Pezzarossi, Lisa) |
|
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 11/03 9:30 AM
Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting13 Assented to Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Responses due by 11/9/2017 (Pezzarossi, Lisa) |
|
Thursday, November 02, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 11/02 4:58 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to November 9, 2017 by Joan Berthelot.(Dion, Todd) |
|
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 10/20 2:55 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 11/02/2017 to File Response/Reply as to7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ,8 Memorandum in Support of Motion, by Joan Berthelot.(Dion, Todd) |
|
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 10/06 8:41 AM
Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting10 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to October 19, 2017 to File Response/Reply as to7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. (Pezzarossi, Lisa) |
|
Thursday, October 05, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 10/05 8:24 AM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to October 19, 2017 to File Response/Reply as to7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Joan Berthelot.(Dion, Todd) |
|
Wednesday, September 27, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
State Court Record - answer filed in state court
Wed 09/27 10:19 AM
STATE COURT Record. (Maynard, Timothy) |
|
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
9
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Thu 09/21 4:31 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee for Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp., CSMC Mortgage-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-6, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Fialkow, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 (Note), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 (35B/35C Affidavit), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 (Power of Attorney) | ||
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Thu 09/21 4:27 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee for Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp., CSMC Mortgage-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-6, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Fialkow, David) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel
Fri 09/15 12:00 PM
Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Halley, Taylor) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Fri 09/15 11:59 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Halley, Taylor) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 09/15 10:04 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by David E. Fialkow on behalf of U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee for Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp., CSMC Mortgage-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-6, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Fialkow, David) |
|
Thursday, September 14, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 09/14 5:03 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Watson, Hollee) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 09/14 5:02 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee for Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp., CSMC Mortgage-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-6. (Watson, Hollee) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Thu 09/14 4:53 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee for Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp., CSMC Mortgage-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-6, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-6796889 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid)(Watson, Hollee) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 (State Court Complaint), | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit (Category Form) |