ULLOA MARTINEZ v. EDWARDS et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Esther Salas |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-07113 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa |
Case Filed: | Sep 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 14, 2018 |
Notice Only
nefpsES
|
|
Petitioner
NAUN ALEXANDER ULLOA MARTINEZ
|
|
Respondent
ELAINE DUKE
|
|
Respondent
JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS
|
|
Respondent
RONALD P EDWARDS
|
|
Respondent
THOMAS R. DECKER
|
|
Respondent
U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Friday, September 14, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 09/17 3:07 PM
ORDER that Petitioner's Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2241 (D.E. No. 1) is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice as Petitioner has been removed and is no longer in custody; that the Clerk of the Court shall mark this matter CLOSED.. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 9/14/2018. (ld, ) |
|
29 | 29
5
pgs
order
Opinion
Mon 09/17 3:05 PM
OPINION. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 9/14/2018. (ld, ) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Mon 09/17 3:07 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (ld, ) |
||
Tuesday, August 21, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Letter
Tue 08/21 5:34 PM
Letter from Anthony LaBruna re27 Letter, 26 Order,.(LABRUNA, ANTHONY) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Manuel Deleon | ||
Monday, August 20, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Letter
Mon 08/20 6:48 PM
Letter re 26 Order,. (LABRUNA, ANTHONY) |
|
Thursday, August 16, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
order
Order
Thu 08/16 12:36 PM
TEXT ORDER: According to the online database maintained by Immigration and Customs Enforcement, it appears that Petitioner is no longer in their custody and therefore may have been removed. Within 5 days of the date of this Order, Respondent shall advise the Court if that is correct and provide any supporting documentation. So Ordered by Judge Esther Salas on 8/16/2018. (ps, ) |
|
Wednesday, August 01, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Letter
Wed 08/01 5:23 PM
Letter from Respondent in response to Petitioner's July 23rd letter. (LABRUNA, ANTHONY) |
|
Monday, July 30, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order
Mon 07/30 4:17 PM
TEXT ORDER: Within 5 days of the date of this Order, Respondent shall file a response to Petitioner's July 23rd letter (ECF No. 22) wherein he argues that the Petition is not moot because collateral consequences survive deportation. So Ordered by Judge Esther Salas on 7/30/2018. (ps, ) |
|
Wednesday, July 25, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Letter
Wed 07/25 12:00 PM
Letter from Anthony J. LaBruna. (LABRUNA, ANTHONY) |
|
Monday, July 23, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
respoth
Brief
Mon 07/23 11:06 AM
BRIEF Supplemental Brief Pursuant to this Court's July 17, 2018 Order(JACKEL, ROBERT) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Copy of BIA Order in Asylum Appeal | ||
Tuesday, July 17, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
3
pgs
order
Order
Wed 07/18 12:54 PM
ORDER that the oral argument scheduled for July 24, 2018 is CANCELED; uponreview of the supplemental briefing, the Court will re-schedule if necessary; that within 5 days after the date of entry of this Order, Petitioner shall file a response to the issues raised by the Court above; within 5 days after Petitioner files his response, Respondent may file a response, if needed. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 7/17/2018. (ld, ) |
|
Monday, July 09, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Letter
Mon 07/09 3:14 PM
Letter from Anthony J. LaBruna. (LABRUNA, ANTHONY) |
|
Tuesday, July 03, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order
Tue 07/03 11:39 AM
TEXT ORDER: On or before July 9, 2018, counsel for Respondent shall file a response to Petitioner's letter dated June 28, 2018 (D.E. No. 18). So Ordered by Judge Esther Salas on 7/3/2018. (ps, ) |
|
Thursday, June 28, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Letter
Thu 06/28 11:04 AM
Letter from Robert Jackel.(JACKEL, ROBERT) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Wednesday, June 13, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 06/13 3:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ANTHONY J. LABRUNA, JR on behalf of RONALD P EDWARDS (LABRUNA, ANTHONY) |
|
16 | 16
order
Order
Wed 06/13 2:03 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold Oral Argument on this matter on 7/24/2018 at 1:00 PM. Parties should be prepared to address the application of 8 U.S.C. § 1232(c)(2)(B), both in general and its relation to habeas proceedings. The parties should also be prepared to address the recent Supreme Court decision in Jennings and its affect on 8 U.S.C. § 1225 and prior Third Circuit case law. So Ordered by Judge Esther Salas on 6/13/2018. (ps, ) |
|
Friday, May 18, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
respoth
Response (NOT Motion)
Fri 05/18 11:38 AM
RESPONSE re14 Letter. (JACKEL, ROBERT) |
|
Monday, April 30, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Letter
Mon 04/30 3:43 PM
Letter from Bryan Lonegan. (LONEGAN, BRYAN) |
|
Tuesday, April 10, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
3
pgs
order
Order
Wed 04/11 4:47 PM
ORDER that within 30 days after the date of entry of this Order, Respondent shall file supplemental briefing addressing Jennings v. Rodriguez and its application to Petitioner's pending claims; Respondent shall also address Petitioner's argument in his supplemental Reply regarding the custody of UAC's when released to parents, as discussed above; that Petitioner may file and serve a response within 20 days of the filing of Respondent's supplemental briefing. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 4/10/2018. (ld, ) |
|
Friday, March 09, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
respoth
Response (NOT Motion)
Fri 03/09 2:18 PM
RESPONSE re11 Letter.(JACKEL, ROBERT) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit G-I | ||
Wednesday, February 28, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Letter
Wed 02/28 6:08 PM
Letter from Bryan Lonegan. (LONEGAN, BRYAN) |
|
Friday, February 09, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 02/09 4:36 PM
ORDER that within 20 days from the date of this Order, Respondent shall submit a supplemental Answer that addresses the issues identified herein; that within 15 days of the date of Respondent's supplemental Answer, Petitioner may file a supplemental reply. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 2/9/2018. (ld, ) |
|
Thursday, December 07, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
respoth
Response (NOT Motion)
Fri 12/08 8:05 AM
PETITIONER'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (cm, ) |
|
Friday, December 01, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Exhibit (to Document)
Fri 12/01 11:05 AM
Exhibit to7 Response to Habeas Petition by RONALD P EDWARDS. (LONEGAN, BRYAN) |
|
Thursday, November 30, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Response to Habeas Petition
Thu 11/30 11:07 AM
RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by RONALD P EDWARDS.(LONEGAN, BRYAN) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 11/20 3:11 PM
ORDER granting request for an eleven-day extension of time, from November 20, 2017 to December 1, 2017, to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the habeas petition; Future extensions will be granted sparingly (if at all). Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 11/20/2017. (ld, ) |
|
Sunday, November 19, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Sun 11/19 10:33 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition filed by NAUN ALEXANDER ULLOA MARTINEZ re4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (JACKEL, ROBERT) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2) |
|
Friday, November 17, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 11/17 3:44 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by RONALD P EDWARDS. (LONEGAN, BRYAN) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Substitution of Attorney
Fri 11/17 3:43 PM
Substitution of Attorney - Attorney CAROLINE A. SADLOWSKI terminated. Attorney BRYAN K. LONEGAN for RONALD P EDWARDS added.. (LONEGAN, BRYAN) |
|
Thursday, October 05, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
3
pgs
order
Order to Answer
Thu 10/05 12:16 PM
ORDER TO ANSWER; that the Clerk of the Court shall serve copies of the Petition and this Order upon Respondent Ronald Edwards by regular mail; that the Clerk of the Court shall forward a copy of the Petition and this Order to Chief, Civil Division, United States Attorney's Office, at the following email address: USANJ-HabeasCases@usdoj.gov; that, within 45 days after the date of entry of this Order, Respondent shall electronically file a full and complete Answer to said Petition, which responds to the factual and legal allegations of the Petition paragraph by paragraph, etc. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 10/5/2017. (ld, ) |
|
Thursday, September 14, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Thu 09/14 5:27 PM
First PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5.), filed by NAUN ALEXANDER ULLOA MARTINEZ.(JACKEL, ROBERT) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit EXHIBITS A-F | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Fri 09/15 10:16 AM
Judge Esther Salas added. (eu, ) |