Griffin v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Oklahoma Western District Court | |
Judge: | Shon T Erwin |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00990 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWW) |
Case Filed: | Sep 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 03, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, January 30, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Thu 01/30 3:50 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting22 Motion for Attorney Fees; See Order as more fully set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 1/30/2020. (mc) |
|
Tuesday, December 03, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
respm
Response to Motion
Tue 12/03 12:34 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re22 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Berger, Allan) |
|
Thursday, November 21, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Attorney Fees
Thu 11/21 4:19 PM
MOTION for Attorney Fees by Pamela Griffin.(Mitzner, Miles) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1- Fee agreement, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2- Notice of Award, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3-Statement of Time | ||
Wednesday, November 13, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to
Wed 11/13 11:42 AM
ORDER granting20 Motion for Relief Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 60(b)(6); Plaintiff shall file her motion for attorney fees within ten (10) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 11/13/19. (mc) |
|
Monday, November 11, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Leave
Mon 11/11 10:38 AM
MOTION for Leave by Pamela Griffin. (Mitzner, Miles) |
|
Monday, June 25, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Mon 06/25 3:22 PM
ORDER granting18 Motion for Attorney Fees; See order as more fully set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 6/25/18. (mc) |
|
Tuesday, June 19, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Attorney Fees
Tue 06/19 3:23 PM
MOTION for Attorney Fees Stipulated by Pamela Griffin. (Mitzner, Miles) |
|
Thursday, May 03, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
order
Judgment
Thu 05/03 1:49 PM
JUDGMENT -- In accordance with the order entered this date, the decision of defendant, Commissioner of the Social Security Administration, is REVERSED and the case is REMANDED for further administrative proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 5/3/18. (mc) |
|
16 | 16
10
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion
Thu 05/03 1:47 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER -- The Court has reviewed the medical evidence of record, the transcript of the administrative hearing, the decision of the ALJ, and the pleadings and briefs of the parties. Based on the forgoing analysis, the Court REVERSES AND REMANDS the Commissioner's decision. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 5/3/18. (mc) |
|
Friday, March 09, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 03/09 10:59 AM
ORDER granting13 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Narissa C Webber terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 3/9/18. (mc) |
|
Wednesday, March 07, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
respm
Social Security Response Brief
Wed 03/07 6:34 PM
Social Security Response Brief re11 Social Security Opening Brief filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Berger, Allan) |
|
Friday, March 02, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 03/02 10:41 AM
UNOPPOSED MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Webber, Narissa) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Entry of Appearance
Fri 03/02 10:41 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Allan D Berger on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security Administration (Berger, Allan) |
|
Friday, January 12, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Social Security Opening Brief
Fri 01/12 4:45 PM
Social Security Opening Brief filed by Pamela Griffin. (Mitzner, Miles) |
|
Tuesday, November 28, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 11/28 10:32 AM
ORDER ESTABLISHING BRIEFING SCHEDULE *** Plaintiff's brief is due within 45 days from the date of this Order; Defendant's brief is due within 60 days of the filing of Plaintiff's brief and Plaintiff may file a reply brief within 10 days of the filing of Defendant's brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 11/28/17. (mc) |
|
Monday, November 27, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Social Security Admin Record
Mon 11/27 1:57 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION RECORD filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.(Webber, Narissa) |
|
Att: 1 Court Transcript Index, | ||
Att: 2 ALJ Dec. & ODAR Hearing Transcript, | ||
Att: 3 Payment Documents and Decisions, | ||
Att: 4 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, | ||
Att: 5 Non Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 6 Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 7 Medical Records Part 1, | ||
Att: 8 Medical Records Part 2 | ||
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge
Tue 11/21 2:25 PM
CONSENT to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge by Pamela Griffin. (Mitzner, Miles) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge
Tue 11/21 2:17 PM
CONSENT to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge by Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Webber, Narissa) |
|
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint (Social Security)
Tue 11/21 2:16 PM
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT - SOCIAL SECURITY by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.(Webber, Narissa) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Entry of Appearance
Tue 11/21 2:16 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Narissa C Webber on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security Administration (Webber, Narissa) |
|
Monday, October 02, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Mon 10/02 1:32 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Pamela Griffin. Commissioner of Social Security Administration served on 9/25/2017. (Mitzner, Miles) |
|
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
misc
Payment for a Civil Case
Thu 09/21 9:05 AM
PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2561510. (Mitzner, Miles) |
||
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Entry of Appearance
Fri 09/15 9:45 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Miles L Mitzner on behalf of Pamela Griffin (Mitzner, Miles) |
|
misc
Payment for a Civil Case
Fri 09/15 9:48 AM
PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2558187. (Mitzner, Miles) |
||
Thursday, September 14, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Thu 09/14 11:11 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (kr) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint Social Security
Thu 09/14 11:05 AM
COMPLAINT (Social Security) against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Pamela Griffin.(kr) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |