J and J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Eric Fambona-Rios et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | William D Keller |
Referred: | Paul L Abrams |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-06763 |
Nature of Suit | 490 Other Statutes - Cable/Sat TV |
Cause | 47:521 Violations of Cable Communications Act of 1984 |
Case Filed: | Sep 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 07, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 13, 2018 1:31 AM PDT |
Defendant
Yojana Karolina Fambona
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Eric Fambona-Rios
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
J and J Sports Productions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Sunday, August 14, 2022 | ||
34 | 34
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Sun 08/14 1:03 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Eric Bensamochan counsel for Plaintiff J and J Sports Productions, Inc.. ERIC BENSAMOCHAN is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by PREVIOUS ATTORNEY ERIC BENSAMOCHAN. (Bensamochan, Eric) |
|
Wednesday, June 29, 2022 | ||
33 | 33
attorney
Association of Counsel
Wed 06/29 4:24 AM
NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney AL LUSTGARTEN on behalf of Plaintiff J and J Sports Productions, Inc.. Filed by Plaintiff J and J Sports Productions, Inc. (Attorney Al Lustgarten added to party J and J Sports Productions, Inc.(pty:pla))(Lustgarten, Al) |
|
Thursday, April 22, 2021 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Abstract of Judgment issued
Thu 04/22 4:14 PM
ABSTRACT of Judgment issued in favor of Plaintiff J and J Sports Productions, Inc. and against Eric Fambona-Rios individually and dba Pizza Mia in the principal amount of $30,000.00, interest in the amount of $0.00, attorneys fees of $0.00, costs of $0.00. RE: Consent Judgment,30 (shb) |
|
Monday, April 19, 2021 | ||
31 | 31
attorney
Association of Counsel
Mon 04/19 8:23 PM
NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney ERIC BENSAMOCHAN on behalf of Plaintiff J and J Sports Productions, Inc.. Filed by Plaintiff J and J Sports Productions, Inc. (Attorney Eric Bensamochan added to party J and J Sports Productions, Inc.(pty:pla))(Bensamochan, Eric) |
|
Friday, December 07, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
judgmentCV
Judgment - Consent
Fri 12/07 3:51 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED JUDGMENT by Judge William D. Keller. it is hereby stipulate and respectfully request that judgment in the amount of Thirty Thousand Dollars (U.S. $30,000.00) inclusive of attorneys fees and costs be entered in favor of Plaintiff J AND J SPORTS PRODUCTIONS, INC. and against Defendants ERIC FAMBONA-RIOS AND YOJANA KAROLINA FAMBONA. The Parties, and each of them, waive any and all rights to seek a stay of enforcement of said judgment and further request that this Honorable Court enter the requested and stipulated judgment forthwith. Related to: Stipulation for Judgment[29. ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (shb) |
|
Thursday, December 06, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
stip
Judgment
Thu 12/06 5:01 PM
STIPULATION for Judgment as to Defendants ERIC FAMBONA-RIOS AND YOJANA KAROLINA FAMBONA filed by Plaintiff J and J Sports Productions, Inc..(Riley, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, November 27, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 11/27 2:11 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge William D. Keller. On the Court's own motion, the Court takes off-calendar and under submission the Motion for Partial Summary Judgment27 , previously scheduled for 12/3/2018, at 10:00 AM. No appearance is necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smo) |
|
Monday, October 29, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Summary Judgment (Partial)
Mon 10/29 2:42 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to the issue of liability in favor of Plaintiff filed by Plaintiff J and J Sports Productions, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 12/3/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge William D. Keller. (Riley, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 statement of uncontroverted facts, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration, | ||
Att: 4 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, September 27, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Status Report
Thu 09/27 4:04 PM
STATUS REPORT RE: OUTCOME OF THE MEDIATION filed by Plaintiff J and J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Riley, Thomas) |
|
25 | 25
adr
Mediation Report (ADR-3) Unable to Reach Agreement
Thu 09/27 3:59 PM
MEDIATION REPORT Filed by Mediator (ADR Panel) Gail Killefer: Mediation held on September 27, 2018. The parties are unable to reach an agreement at this time. Counsel: Please evaluate the effectiveness of the ADR Program by completing a survey on your mediation experience. To access the survey, click on the following link:[LINK:MediationParticipantSurvey] (Killefer, Gail) |
|
Monday, September 24, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
adr
Notice of Mediation Date (ADR-13)
Mon 09/24 5:10 PM
NOTICE OF MEDIATION DATE filed. Mediation set for September 27, 2018, at 1:30 p.m.(Killefer, Gail) |
|
Thursday, September 06, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
adr
Notice of Mediation Date (ADR-13)
Thu 09/06 5:03 PM
NOTICE OF MEDIATION DATE filed. Mediation set for September 27, 2018, at 1:30 p.m.(Killefer, Gail) |
|
Monday, January 29, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
5
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 01/30 11:48 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND ORDER/REFERRAL TO ADR by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. All discovery shall be completed on or before JULY 30, 2018. All discovery motions shall be filed and served on or before JULY 30, 2018. This case is referred to the ADR Program. Within thirty (30) days of the filing date of this Order, plaintiff shall contact the ADR Program Director, Gail Killefer (213-894-2993), to schedule a mediation with her. The mediation must be concluded NO LATER THAN SEPTEMBER 28, 2018. All motions other than discovery motions, including but not limited to motions for summary judgment, shall be filed and served on or before OCTOBER 29, 2018. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (ch) |
|
Tuesday, January 23, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Status Report
Tue 01/23 3:04 PM
STATUS REPORT RE: REFERRAL OF ACTION TO THE HONORABLE MAGISTRATE JUDGE PAUL L. ABRAMS filed by Plaintiff J and J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Riley, Thomas) |
|
20 | 20
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Tue 01/23 12:01 PM
MINUTE IN CHAMBERS REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR ALL NECESSARY DISCOVERY AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCES by Judge William D. Keller: The Court has reviewed the complaint and answer and refers this matter to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams for all necessary discovery proceedings and for settlement conferences. Plaintiff shall notify Magistrate Judge Abrams immediately of the Court's referral and file a status report with this Court confirming the same. If theparties fail to reach a settlement, the parties are ordered to submit stipulation and proposed scheduling order for further proceedings no later than seven (7) days after the conference is completed. (shb) |
|
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 01/22 3:36 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendants Yojana Karolina Fambona, Eric Fambona-Rios.(Kerendian, Ramin) |
|
Tuesday, January 09, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
order
Extending Answer Due Deadline
Tue 01/09 3:32 PM
ORDER by Judge William D. Keller: The Stipulation Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to Initial Complaint17 is APPROVED and SO ORDERED. Defendants shall respond no later than 1/19/2018. (cw) |
|
Thursday, January 04, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Thu 01/04 1:12 PM
Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, filed by Defendants Eric Fambona-Rios, Yojana Karolina Fambona.(Kerendian, Ramin) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, December 11, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Extending Answer Due Deadline
Mon 12/11 12:38 PM
ORDER by Judge William D. Keller: The Stipulation Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to Initial Complaint14 is GRANTED. *Counsel are reminded to comply with Local Rule 5-4.4.2 in future filings.* (Defendants Yojana Karolina Fambona's answer due 1/3/2018; Eric Fambona-Rios' answer due 1/3/2018.) (cw) |
|
Friday, December 08, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 12/08 2:50 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants All Defendants, (Attorney Ramin Joseph Kerendian added to party Yojana Karolina Fambona(pty:dft), Attorney Ramin Joseph Kerendian added to party Eric Fambona-Rios (pty:dft))(Kerendian, Ramin) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Miscellaneous Document
Fri 12/08 2:32 PM
Stipulation extending time to file answer(Kerendian, Ramin) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, December 06, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Wed 12/06 10:47 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff J and J Sports Productions, Inc., re Order to Show Cause,12 served on 12-6-17. (Riley, Thomas) |
|
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Wed 12/06 8:56 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge William D. Keller: For the reasons stated herein, a Response to Order to Show Cause is due by 12/13/2017. Plaintiff's counsel is ordered to serve this minute order on all defendants within 24 hours from the date of this order. (cw) |
|
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Tue 11/14 1:04 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff J and J Sports Productions, Inc., upon Defendant Yojana Karolina Fambona served on 11/10/2017, answer due 12/1/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Eric Fombona-Rios, husband/Owner in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Riley, Thomas) |
|
10 | 10
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Tue 11/14 1:02 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff J and J Sports Productions, Inc., upon Defendant Eric Fambona-Rios served on 11/10/2017, answer due 12/1/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Eric Fombona-Rios in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Riley, Thomas) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
textonly
Text Only Cable Case Assignment
Fri 09/15 10:48 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Phillip S. Gutierrez, Chair of the Case Management and Assignment Committee: Pursuant to General Order 16-05, all related J & J Sports Productions Inc. cases have been assigned to Judge William D. Keller for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that are or may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are referred to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. The Related Group Control Number is CV 07-3816 WDK(FMOx). THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ghap) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 09/15 10:46 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Yojana Karolina Fambona. (ghap) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 09/15 10:45 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Eric Fambona-Rios. (ghap) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 09/15 10:38 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge William D. Keller and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (ghap) |
|
Thursday, September 14, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Summons Request
Thu 09/14 7:34 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Riley, Thomas) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Thu 09/14 7:34 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Riley, Thomas) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 09/14 7:32 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff J & J Sports Productions, Inc., identifying N/A. (Riley, Thomas) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 09/14 7:30 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Riley, Thomas) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 09/14 7:27 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-20502628 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Attorney Thomas P Riley added to party J & J Sports Productions, Inc.(pty:pla))(Riley, Thomas) |