J and J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Olinda Deniese Bran et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | William D Keller |
Referred: | Paul L Abrams |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-06765 |
Nature of Suit | 490 Other Statutes - Cable/Sat TV |
Cause | 47:521 Violations of Cable Communications Act of 1984 |
Case Filed: | Sep 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 16, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 13, 2018 1:38 AM PDT |
Defendant
Olinda Deniese Bran
|
|
Defendant
Mariscos La Barca, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
J and J Sports Productions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, August 30, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Satisfaction of Judgment
Thu 08/30 2:25 PM
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re Default Judgment,,21 entered In favor of J and J Sports Productions, Inc. Against Olinda Deniese Bran, In favor of J and J Sports Productions, Inc. Against Mariscos La Barca, Inc. filed by Plaintiff J and J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Riley, Thomas) |
|
Friday, August 17, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Fri 08/17 2:18 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff J and J Sports Productions, Inc., re Default Judgment,,21 , Order on Motion for Default Judgment,,20 served on 8/17/18. (Riley, Thomas) |
|
Thursday, August 16, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
judgmentCV
Judgment - Default by Judge
Thu 08/16 3:53 PM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT by Judge William D. Keller. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Default Judgment in this case is granted in favor of the plaintiff J & J Sports Productions, Inc. against defendants, Olinda Deniese Bran, individually and d/b/a Mariscos La Barca and Mariscos La Barca, Inc., an unknown business entity d/b/a Mariscos La Barca as follows: defendants Olinda Deniese Bran, individually and d/b/a Mariscos La Barca and Mariscos La Barca, Inc., an unknown business entity d/b/a Mariscos La Barca, shall pay the plaintiff, J & J Sports Productions, Inc., $3,600.00 in total damages plus attorneys fees in the amount of $560.00 plus costs. MD JS-6. Case Terminated (shb) |
|
20 | 20
order
Default Judgment
Thu 08/16 3:47 PM
ORDER by Judge William D. Keller: GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT17 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Default Judgment in the total amount of $4,160.00 is therefore GRANTED against Olinda Deniese Bran,individually and d/b/a Mariscos La Barca and Mariscos La Barca, Inc., an unknown business entity d/b/a Mariscos La Barca. This award includes $1,800.00in actual damages plus $1,800.00 in punitive damages based on willfulness, an amount that is equal to one times the actual damages. The Court further grants plaintiff $560.00 in attorneys fees. Costs are to be submitted in cost bill. (shb) |
|
Thursday, February 15, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Thu 02/15 3:28 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff J and J Sports Productions, Inc., re Text Only Scheduling Notice, 18 served on 2/15/18. (Riley, Thomas) |
|
18 | 18
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 02/15 1:03 PM
TEXT ONLY NOTICE (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge William D. Keller: On the court's own motion, the Motion for Default Judgment17 filed by the Plaintiff set for 02/26/18 is taken off calendar and is now under submission. No appearances are necessary on 02/26/18. The court's order will issue. Plaintiff counsel is ordered to serve this order on all defendants within 48 hours of this notice. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lk) |
|
Wednesday, January 17, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Default Judgment
Wed 01/17 5:09 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against defendant Olinda Deniese Bran and Mariscos La Barca, Inc filed by Plaintiff J and J Sports Productions, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 2/26/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge William D. Keller. (Riley, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 4 Declaration, | ||
Att: 5 Affidavit | ||
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form
Thu 12/14 3:46 PM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Olinda Deniese Bran, individually and d/b/a Mariscos La Barca, Mariscos La Barca, Inc., an unknown business entity, d/b/a Mariscos La Barca (shb) |
|
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Clerk to Enter Default
Wed 12/13 2:11 PM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Olinda Deniese Bran, Mariscos La Barca, Inc. filed by Plaintiff J and J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Riley, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit In Support of Request to Enter Default | ||
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Tue 11/14 1:47 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff J and J Sports Productions, Inc., upon Defendant Mariscos La Barca, Inc. served on 11/11/2017, answer due 12/4/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Marco Arellare, manager in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Riley, Thomas) |
|
13 | 13
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Tue 11/14 1:44 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff J and J Sports Productions, Inc., upon Defendant Olinda Deniese Bran served on 11/11/2017, answer due 12/4/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Marco Arellare, manager in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Riley, Thomas) |
|
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 09/21 2:44 PM
AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff J and J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Riley, Thomas) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Errata
Thu 09/21 2:42 PM
NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff J and J Sports Productions, Inc.. correcting Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening - optional html form,,,7 Civil Cover Sheet (Riley, Thomas) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
textonly
Text Only Cable Case Assignment
Fri 09/15 12:38 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Phillip S. Gutierrez, Chair of the Case Management and Assignment Committee: Pursuant to General Order 16-05, all related J & J Sports Productions Inc. cases have been assigned to Judge William D. Keller for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that are or may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are referred to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. The Related Group Control Number is CV 07-3816 WDK(FMOx). THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (car) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 09/15 12:35 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Mariscos La Barca, Inc. (car) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 09/15 12:34 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Olinda Deniese Bran. (car) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening
Fri 09/15 12:30 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 . The following error(s) was found: The caption on the document uploaded to the docket entry number referenced above does not match the case information on the docket (e.g., case title, case number, document name, etc.). The Court may 1)order an amended or corrected document to be filed, 2)order the document stricken, or 3)take other action the Court deems appropriate. You may file a Notice of Errata attaching a corrected version of the document, but you are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (car) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 09/15 12:24 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge William D. Keller and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (car) |
|
Thursday, September 14, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Summons Request
Thu 09/14 8:22 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Riley, Thomas) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Thu 09/14 8:21 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Riley, Thomas) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 09/14 8:20 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff J & J Sports Productions, Inc., identifying N/A. (Riley, Thomas) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 09/14 8:19 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Riley, Thomas) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 09/14 8:17 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-20502811 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Attorney Thomas P Riley added to party J & J Sports Productions, Inc.(pty:pla))(Riley, Thomas) |