Ilene Rosalina Ramirez v. Nancy A. Berryhill
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Victor E Bianchini |
Referred: | Alicia G Rosenberg |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-01879 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Sep 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 30, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, October 18, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
order
Awarding EAJA Fees
Mon 10/22 3:42 PM
ORDER AWARDING EAJA FEES by Magistrate Judge Victor E Bianchini. Re: Stipulation for Award of EAJA Fees25 . IT IS ORDERED that fees and expenses in the amount of $4,000.00 as authorized by 28 U.S.C. § 2412, and no costs authorized by 28 U.S.C. § 1920, be awarded subject to the terms of the Stipulation. (hr) |
|
Thursday, October 04, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
stip
Award of EAJA Fees
Thu 10/04 2:46 PM
STIPULATION FOR AWARD of EAJA Fees in the amount of $4000. filed by Plaintiff Ilene Rosalina Ramirez.(Shapiro, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
Sunday, September 30, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
judgmentCV
Judgment
Mon 10/01 11:20 AM
JUDGMENT by Magistrate Judge Victor E Bianchini, in favor of Ilene Rosalina Ramirez against Nancy A. Berryhill Related to: Order,23 . Plaintiff's request for an order remanding this case for further proceedings is GRANTED and the Commissioner's decision is REVERSED. (See document for details.) (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (sbou) |
|
23 | 23
15
pgs
order
Order
Mon 10/01 11:16 AM
DECISION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Victor E Bianchini. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Judgment be entered REVERSING the Commissioner's decision and REMANDING this matter for further proceedings consistent with this Decision and Order, and it is further ORDERED. (See document for further details.) (sbou) |
|
Friday, August 03, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (AUSA filers only)
Fri 08/03 2:33 PM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Snyder, Patrick) |
|
Tuesday, May 22, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (non-AUSA)
Tue 05/22 10:34 AM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Ilene Rosalina Ramirez. (Shapiro, Brian) |
|
Monday, May 21, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
cs_rasgn
Chief Magistrate Judge Transferring Case (non-consent)
Mon 05/21 4:42 PM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF MAGISTRATE JUDGE - OCMJ# 18-053 by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF THE CALENDAR of Magistrate Judge Victor E. Bianchini, this case is transferred from the calendar of Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg to the calendar of Magistrate Judge Victor E Bianchini for all further proceedings authorized by statute, local rules and general orders. All documents subsequently filed shall bear this new case designation 5:17-cv-01879 VEB absent further order of the Court. (esa) |
|
Thursday, May 03, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
stip
Joint Stipulation for Social Security Cases
Thu 05/03 3:22 PM
JOINT STIPULATION, on behalf of both parties, for Disposition of Claim from Relief From Decision of the Commissioner, filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill.(Snyder, Patrick) |
|
Tuesday, April 10, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Tue 04/10 10:14 AM
Effective April 19, 2018, Judge Rosenberg will be located at the Edward R. Roybal Federal Building, COURTROOM 550 on the 5th floor, located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 550 of the Roybal Federal Building, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box located outside the Clerk's Office on the 12th floor of the Roybal Federal Building. The location for filing civil and criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services is located at the Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Room 180 (Terrace Level), Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) |
|
Tuesday, March 20, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 03/20 1:04 PM
ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File16 . The Defendant has an extension of time of 30 days making Defendant's portion of the Joint Stipulation due April 13, 2018, with all other deadlines being extended accordingly, making Plaintiff's reply due April 27, 2018 and the Joint Stipulation due to be filed on May 4, 2018. (hr) |
|
16 | 16
stip
Extension of Time to File Document
Tue 03/20 9:15 AM
First STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Joint Stipulation filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill.(Snyder, Patrick) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, January 03, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
respoth
Administrative Record
Wed 01/03 8:58 AM
CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD OF ILENE ROSALINA RAMIREZ (mj) filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill.(Snyder, Patrick) |
|
Att: 1 Certification Page, | ||
Att: 2 Court Transcript Index, | ||
Att: 3 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, | ||
Att: 4 Payment Documents and Decisions, | ||
Att: 5 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, | ||
Att: 6 Non Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 7 Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 8 Medical Records Part 1, | ||
Att: 9 Medical Records Part 2, | ||
Att: 10 Medical Records Part 3, | ||
Att: 11 Medical Records Part 4 | ||
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 01/03 8:54 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 (mj) filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill.(Snyder, Patrick) |
|
Tuesday, November 07, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice from Clerk re Final Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge
Tue 11/07 10:19 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg for all further proceedings. Please use the case number EDCV17-1879 AGR on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn) |
|
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (AUSA filers only)
Mon 11/06 12:27 PM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attorney Patrick W Snyder added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft))(Snyder, Patrick) |
|
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (non-AUSA)
Wed 10/11 9:17 AM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), (Shapiro, Brian) |
|
10 | 10
service
Service of Summons and Social Security Complaint Returned Executed as to USA (120 days)
Wed 10/11 9:15 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ilene Rosalina Ramirez, upon Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 10/5/2017, answer due 2/2/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned.(Shapiro, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
7
pgs
order
Order
Tue 09/26 5:35 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 . THE COURT'S CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER HAS BEEN REVISED EFFECTIVE JANUARY 2016. PLEASE REVIEW THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. In accordance with General Order 05-01, this case is designated for electronic filing. A chambers copy is required only for the joint stipulation and the certified administrative record. (See Order for details.) (mp) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Thu 09/21 3:39 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (mp) |
|
7 | 7
order
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Thu 09/21 3:34 PM
ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg: granting3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is hereby GRANTED. (mp) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form
Fri 09/15 10:06 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (et) |
|
Thursday, September 14, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 09/14 10:45 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Ilene Rosalina Ramirez, (Shapiro, Brian) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 09/14 10:44 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ilene Rosalina Ramirez. (Shapiro, Brian) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Thu 09/14 10:43 AM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Ilene Rosalina Ramirez. (Shapiro, Brian) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Summons Request
Thu 09/14 10:42 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Ilene Rosalina Ramirez. (Shapiro, Brian) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 09/14 10:41 AM
COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Ilene Rosalina Ramirez. (Attorney Brian C Shapiro added to party Ilene Rosalina Ramirez(pty:pla))(Shapiro, Brian) |