Donohue v. Madison
Original Case: 1:13-cv-00918
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-02833 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Case Filed: | Sep 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 18, 2019 |
Last checked: Thursday Nov 21, 2019 3:44 AM EST |
Defendant
Thomas J. Madison, Jr., Individually and in his official capacity as Executive Director of the New York State Thruway Authority and the New York State Canal Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Jose Holguin-Veras, Individually and in his official capacity as Board Member of New York State Thruway/Canal Corporation Board of Directors and in his official capacity as Board Member of the New York State Thruway Authority
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
J. Donald Rice, Jr., Individually and in his official capacity as Board Member of the New York State Thruway/Canal Corporation Board of Directors
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Brandon R. Sall, Individually in his official capacity as Board Member of New York State Thruway/Canal Corporation Board of Directors and in his official capacity as Board Member of the New York State Thruway Authority
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Richard N. Simberg, Individually and in his official capacity as Board Member of New York State Thruway/Canal Corporation Board of Directors and in his official capacity as Board Member of the New York State Thruway Authority
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Donna J. Luh, Individually and in her official capacity as Vice-Chairman New York State Thruway/Canal Corporation Board of Directors and in her official capacity as Vice-Chair of the New York State of Thruway Authority Board of Directors
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
New York State Canal Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
New York State Thruway Authority
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
E. Virgil Conway, Individually and in his official capacity as Board Member of the New York State Thruway/Canal Corporation Board of Directors
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Howard P. Milstein, Individually and in his official capacity as Chairman of New York State Thruway Authority/Canal Corporation Board of Directors
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Brian U. Stratton, Individually and in his official capacity as Director of the New York State Canal Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Carlos Milan, Individually and in his official capacity as Director of Employee Relations and Employee Safety, New York State Thruway Authority and New York State Canal Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Bouleris, Individually and on behalf of all others similarly-situated
|
|
Plaintiff
David M. Mazzeo, Individually and on behalf of all others similarly-situated
|
|
Plaintiff
George E. Savoie
|
|
Plaintiff
Joseph E. Colombo
|
|
Plaintiff
New York State Thruway Employees Local 72
|
|
Plaintiff
Marcos Diamantatos, Individually and on behalf of all others similarly-situated
|
|
Plaintiff
Maureen Alonzo, Individually and on behalf of all others similarly-situated
|
|
Plaintiff
John Dellio, Individually and on behalf of all others similarly-situated
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Wiedeman, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
John Metzgier, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
William Miller, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
William Coleman, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Civil Service Employees Association, Local 1000 AFSCME, AFL-CIO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Danny Donohue, as President of the Civil Service Employees Association, Inc., Local 1000, AFSCME, AFL-CIO
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Nov 18 2019
OPINION, affirming in part, vacating and remanding in part the judgment of the district court, by RCW, RJL, RJS, FILED.[2708128] [17-2833] |
Docket last updated: 11/21/2019 3:35 AM EST |
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant E. Virgil Conway, Jose Holguin-Veras, Donna J. Luh, Carlos Milan, Howard P. Milstein, New York State Canal Corporation, New York State Thruway Authority, J. Donald Rice, Jr., Brandon R. Sall, Richard N. Simberg and Brian U. Stratton, FILED. [2124001] 17-2833 [Entered: 09/13/2017 05:07 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 24 pgs DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER, dated 04/14/2017, RECEIVED.[2124877] 17-2833 [Entered: 09/14/2017 03:40 PM] |