New York State Thruway Employe v. New York State Thruway Authori
Original Case: 1:14-cv-01043
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-02834 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Case Filed: | Sep 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 18, 2019 |
Last checked: Thursday Nov 21, 2019 3:36 AM EST |
Defendant
Joseph Bress, individually and in his official capacity as Chief Negotiator of the New York State Thruway Authority
|
|
Defendant
Howard Glaser, individually and in his official capacity as Director of State Operations and Senior Policy Advisor to the Governor of New York
|
|
Defendant
Donald R. Bell, individually and in his official capacity as Director of Maintenance and Operations of the New York State Thruway Authority
|
|
Defendant
Thomas J. Madison, Jr., individually and in his official capacity as Executive Director of the New York State Thruway Authority
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John M. Bryan, in his official capacity as Chief Financial Officer and Treasurer of the New York State Thruway Authority
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Howard P. Milstein, individually and in his official capacity as Chairman of the New York State Thruway Authority
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
John F. Barr, in his official capacity as Director of Administrative Services of the New York State Thruway Authority
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Jose Holguin-Veras, in his official capacity as Board Member of the New York State Thruway Authority
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
J. Donald Rice, Jr., in his official capacity as Board Member of the New York State Thruway Authority
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Richard N. Simberg, in his official capacity as Board Member of the New York State Thruway Authority
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Donna J. Luh, in her official capacity as Vice-Chair of the New York State Thruway Authority Board of Directors
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
John F. Barry, in his official capacity as Director of Administrative Services of the New York State Thruway Authority
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Brandon R. Sall, in his official capacity as Board Member of the New York State Thruway Authority
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
E. Virgil Conway, in his official capacity as Board Member of the New York State Thruway Authority
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Thomas Ryan, in his official capacity
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
New York State Thruway Authority
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
New York State Thruway Employees Local 72
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
David M. Mazzeo, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
George Savoie
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Joseph E. Colombo
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Nov 18 2019
OPINION, affirming in part, vacating and remanding in part the judgment of the district court, by RCW, RJL, RJS, FILED.[2708150] [17-2834] |
Docket last updated: 11/21/2019 3:32 AM EST |
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant John F. Barr, E. Virgil Conway, Jose Holguin-Veras, Donna J. Luh, Howard P. Milstein, New York State Thruway Authority, J. Donald Rice, Jr., Thomas Ryan, Brandon R. Sall and Richard N. Simberg, FILED. [2124024] 17-2834 [Entered: 09/13/2017 05:25 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 24 pgs DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER, dated 04/14/2017, RECEIVED.[2124882] 17-2834 [Entered: 09/14/2017 03:42 PM] |