Aerogroup International, Inc.
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Christopher S Sontchi |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-11962 |
Case Filed: | Sep 15, 2017 |
Dismissed: | Jan 15, 2020 |
Terminated: | Feb 10, 2020 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $50,000,001 to $100 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Aerogroup International, Inc.
201 Meadow Rd
Edison, NJ 08817-6002 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
1. | Aerosoles Parent Files for Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Protection (wsj.com) |
Submitted Sat 09/16/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 10 minutes ago |
Monday, July 19, 2021 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 07/19 3:30 PM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-50383 Closed (DMC) |