Addis Ababa Restaurant, Inc.
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Karen K Brown |
Case #: | 4:17-bk-35413 |
Case Filed: | Sep 15, 2017 |
Dismissed: | Oct 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 21, 2017 |
Debtor
Addis Ababa, Debtor
7668 De Moss Dr
Houston, TX 77036-4904 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Allison D Byman
Hughes Watters Askanase LLP 1201 Louisiana Suite 2800
Houston, TX 77002 |
|
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002 |
Docket last updated: 09/16/2017 12:04 AM CDT |
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
none
Fri 09/15 12:10 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 17-35413 [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 19366718. Fee amount $ 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) [system event]
Fri 09/15 12:07 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Addis Ababa Restaurant, Inc. . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Addis Ababa. (Peake, Sandra) |