United States of America v. Bufford et al
Oklahoma Western District Court | |
Judge: | Joe Heaton |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00996 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 28:1345 Foreclosure |
Case Filed: | Sep 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 30, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 14, 2018 4:00 AM CDT |
Defendant
Jason Dwayne Bufford
|
|
Defendant
Laura Rose Bufford
|
|
Defendant
Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Gulf Coast Bank and Trust Company
|
|
Defendant
Chris Harper
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kirby-Smith Machinery Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Logan County Treasurer
|
|
Defendant
Propane Sales Inc
|
|
Defendant
Logan County Board of County Commissioners
|
|
Plaintiff
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, March 06, 2024 | ||
46 | 46
misc
Satisfaction of Judgment
Wed 03/06 2:13 PM
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re45 Order on Motion for Order by United States of America. (Sewell, Kay) |
|
Wednesday, March 06, 2019 | ||
45 | 45
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Order
Wed 03/06 9:58 AM
ORDER granting36 the government's motion for deficiency judgment after foreclosure sale...see order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 03/06/2019. (lam) |
|
Monday, February 11, 2019 | ||
44 | 44
service
Affidavit of Service - NON SUMMONS
Mon 02/11 9:09 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Motion for Deficiency Judgment and Order served on Jason Dwayne Bufford on February 1, 2019, filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Sewell, Kay) |
|
Thursday, January 31, 2019 | ||
43 | 43
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Thu 01/31 10:38 AM
ORDER granting42 the government's motion for continuance; the motion hearing set 02/05/2019 is CONTINUED to 03/06/2019 @ 9:00 a.m., in Courtroom No. 301. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 01/31/2019. (lam) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 01/31 10:39 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: per order43 the 02/05/2019 motion hearing is continued to 03/06/2019 @ 09:00 AM in Courtroom 301 Honorable Joe Heaton. (lam) |
||
Wednesday, January 30, 2019 | ||
42 | 42
motion
Continue
Wed 01/30 1:06 PM
MOTION to Continue the Hearing on the Motion for Deficiency Judgment by United States of America. (Sewell, Kay) |
|
Monday, December 03, 2018 | ||
41 | 41
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Mon 12/03 1:35 PM
ORDER granting40 the government's motion for continuance; the 12/05/2018 hearing on the government's motion for deficiency judgment after foreclosure sale is continued to 02/05/2018 @ 9:00 a.m., in Courtroom No. 301. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 12/03/2018. (lam) |
|
40 | 40
motion
Continue
Mon 12/03 1:06 PM
MOTION to Continue the Hearing on the Motion for Deficiency Judgment by United States of America. (Sewell, Kay) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Mon 12/03 1:37 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: per order41 the 12/05/2018 hearing is continued to 02/05/2019 @ 09:00 AM in Courtroom 301 Honorable Joe Heaton. (lam) |
||
Wednesday, November 28, 2018 | ||
39 | 39
service
Affidavit of Service - NON SUMMONS
Wed 11/28 8:55 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Hearing on Motion for Deficiency Judgment served on Laura Rose Bufford on November 13, 2018, filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Sewell, Kay) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Wed 11/28 1:19 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Deficiency Judgment after Foreclosure Sale Hearing set for 12/5/2018 @ 09:00 AM in Courtroom 301 Honorable Joe Heaton. (cla) |
||
Tuesday, October 30, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
service
Affidavit of Service - NON SUMMONS
Tue 10/30 10:02 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Hearing on Motion for Deficiency Judgment served on all parties on October 30, 2018, filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Sewell, Kay) |
|
37 | 37
notice
Notice of Hearing on Motion
Tue 10/30 10:01 AM
NOTICE of Hearing on Motion by United States of America36 MOTION for Order for Deficiency Judgment after Foreclosure Sale : (Sewell, Kay) |
|
36 | 36
4
pgs
motion
Order
Tue 10/30 10:00 AM
MOTION for Order for Deficiency Judgment after Foreclosure Sale by United States of America. (Sewell, Kay) |
|
Monday, September 24, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Order
Mon 09/24 3:24 PM
ORDER granting31 the government's motion to confirm U.S. Marshal's sale. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 09/24/2018. (lam) |
|
Thursday, September 20, 2018 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 09/20 2:01 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Motion to Confirm Marshal's Sale31 is set for hearing for 9/24/2018 @ 09:00 AM in Courtroom 301 before Honorable Joe Heaton. (cla) |
||
Monday, September 17, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
service
Proof of Service by Publication
Mon 09/17 11:15 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE by Publication filed by Plaintiff United States of America. Last publication date September 1, 2018.(Sewell, Kay) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-Affidavit of Publication | ||
Monday, August 27, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
service
Affidavit of Service - NON SUMMONS
Mon 08/27 10:35 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Hearing on Motion to Confirm Sale served on all parties on August 27, 2018, filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Sewell, Kay) |
|
32 | 32
notice
Notice of Hearing on Motion
Mon 08/27 10:34 AM
NOTICE of Hearing on Motion by United States of America31 MOTION for Order to Confirm Marshal's Sale : (Sewell, Kay) |
|
31 | 31
4
pgs
motion
Order
Mon 08/27 10:33 AM
MOTION for Order to Confirm Marshal's Sale by United States of America. (Sewell, Kay) |
|
30 | 30
service
Return on Sale - USM
Mon 08/27 8:30 AM
US Marshal's Return on Sale held on August 21, 2018 (Sewell, Kay) |
|
Monday, July 16, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
service
Proof of Service by Publication
Mon 07/16 8:41 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE by Publication filed by Plaintiff United States of America. Last publication date 06/30/2018.(Sewell, Kay) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-Publisher's Affidavit | ||
Tuesday, June 05, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Declaration
Tue 06/05 3:16 PM
DECLARATION by United States of America of Mailing of the Notice of United States Marshal's Sale . (Sewell, Kay) |
|
27 | 27
notice
Notice of United States Marshal's Sale
Tue 06/05 3:15 PM
NOTICE of United States Marshal's Sale by United States of America(Sewell, Kay) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-USMS Notice of Sale | ||
Friday, June 01, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
order
Special Execution and Order of Sale
Mon 06/04 8:51 AM
SPECIAL EXECUTION and ORDER of SALE. Entered at the direction of Honorable Joe Heaton on 6/1/2018. (cla) |
|
Thursday, May 31, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
service
Praecipe for Special Execution and Order of Sale
Thu 05/31 10:24 AM
PRAECIPE for Special Execution and Order of Sale by United States of America. (Sewell, Kay) |
|
Thursday, November 30, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
order
Judgment - Foreclosure
Thu 11/30 2:44 PM
FORECLOSURE JUDGMENT granting government's motion for default judgment...see judgment for specifics. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 11/30/2017. (lam) |
|
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
order
Clerks Entry of Default Order on Motion for Entry of Default
Wed 11/29 9:56 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendants Board of County Commissioners of Logan County, Jason Dwayne Bufford, Laura Rose Bufford, Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation, Gulf Coast Bank and Trust Company, Logan County Treasurer; granting21 Motion for Entry of Default. (lam) |
|
22 | 22
motion
Default Judgment
Wed 11/29 9:15 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Jason Dwayne Bufford, Laura Rose Bufford, Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation, Gulf Coast Bank and Trust Company, Logan County Treasurer and the Board of County Commissioners of Logan County by United States of America. (Sewell, Kay) |
|
21 | 21
motion
Entry of Default
Wed 11/29 9:12 AM
MOTION for Entry of Default by United States of America. (Sewell, Kay) |
|
Tuesday, November 07, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 11/07 10:37 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Jason Dwayne Bufford served on 11/2/2017. (Sewell, Kay) |
|
Thursday, October 19, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Service by Publication
Thu 10/19 11:43 AM
ORDER granting17 government's motion directing service by publication. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 10/19/2017. (lam) |
|
18 | 18
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Order
Thu 10/19 11:41 AM
ORDER granting16 the government's motion directing absent defendants to appear or plead within 80 days from the date of this order. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 10/19/2017. (lam) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Service by Publication
Thu 10/19 9:40 AM
MOTION for Service by Publication as to Absent Defendants by United States of America. (Sewell, Kay) |
|
16 | 16
4
pgs
motion
Order
Thu 10/19 9:39 AM
MOTION for Order Directing Absent Defendants to Appear or Plead by a Day Certain by United States of America. (Sewell, Kay) |
|
15 | 15
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 10/19 7:54 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Board of County Commissioners of Logan County served on 10/18/2017. (Sewell, Kay) |
|
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer
Fri 09/29 3:23 PM
DISCLAIMER of Defendant Propane Sales, Inc. by Propane Sales Inc.(rmc) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer
Tue 09/26 11:31 AM
DISCLAIMER by Chris Harper.(Harper, Chris) |
|
12 | 12
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 09/26 8:07 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation served on 9/18/2017. (Sewell, Kay) |
|
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 09/26 8:06 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Gulf Coast Bank and Trust Company served on 9/18/2017. (Sewell, Kay) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 09/26 8:04 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Laura Rose Bufford served on 9/21/2017. (Sewell, Kay) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 09/22 2:25 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Propane Sales Inc served on 9/18/2017. (Sewell, Kay) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 09/22 2:22 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Chris Harper served on 9/18/2017. (Sewell, Kay) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 09/22 2:21 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Kirby-Smith Machinery Inc served on 9/20/2017. (Sewell, Kay) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 09/22 2:19 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Logan County Treasurer served on 9/18/2017. (Sewell, Kay) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer
Wed 09/20 12:28 PM
DISCLAIMER by Kirby-Smith Machinery Inc.(Booth, Clay) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Entry of Appearance
Wed 09/20 12:25 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Clay P Booth on behalf of Kirby-Smith Machinery Inc (Booth, Clay) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Entry of Appearance
Fri 09/15 11:04 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Kay D Sewell on behalf of United States of America (Sewell, Kay) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 09/15 10:07 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Board of County Commissioners of Logan County, Jason Dwayne Bufford, Laura Rose Bufford, Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation, Gulf Coast Bank and Trust Company, Chris Harper, Kirby-Smith Machinery Inc, Logan County Treasurer, Propane Sales Inc. (rmc) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 09/15 10:06 AM
COMPLAINT against Board of County Commissioners of Logan County, Jason Dwayne Bufford, Laura Rose Bufford, Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation, Gulf Coast Bank and Trust Company, Chris Harper, Kirby-Smith Machinery Inc, Logan County Treasurer, Propane Sales Inc filed by United States of America.(rmc) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-Note, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2-Promissory Note April 15, 2011, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3-Promissory Note May 13, 2011, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4-Mortgage November 21, 2007, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5-Mortgage May 13, 2011, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6-Verification, | ||
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet |