Donohue v. Madison
Original Case: 1:13-cv-00920
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-02832 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Case Filed: | Sep 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 18, 2019 |
Last checked: Thursday Nov 21, 2019 3:39 AM EST |
Defendant
Thomas J. Madison, Jr., Individually and in his official capacity as Executive Director of the New York State Thruway Authority and the New York State Canal Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Howard P. Milstein, Individually and in his official capacity as Chairman of New York State Thruway/Canal Corporation Board of Directors
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Carlos Milan, in his official capacity as Director of Employee Relations and Employee Safety, New York State Thruway Authority and New York State Canal Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
New York State Thruway Authority
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Jose Holguin-Veras, Individually
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
J. Donald Rice, Jr., Individually
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Brandon R. Sall, Individually
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Richard N. Simberg, Individually
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
E. Virgil Conway, in his official capacity as Board Member of New York State Thruway/Canal Corporation Board of Directors
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Donna J. Luh, Individually
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Carlos Millan, in his official capacity as Director of Employee Relations and Employee Safety, New York State Thruway Authority and New York State Canal Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Danny Donohue, as President of the Civil Service Employees Association, Inc., Local 1000, AFSCME, AFL-CIO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Marcos Diamantatos, Individually and on behalf of all others similarly-situated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Maureen Alonzo, Individually and on behalf of all others similarly-situated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Michael Bouleris, Individually and on behalf of all others similarly-situated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
John Dellio, Individually and on behalf of all others similarly-situated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Civil Service Employees Association, Local 1000 AFSCME, AFL-CIO
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Nov 18 2019
OPINION, affirming in part, vacating and remanding in part the judgment of the district court, by RCW, RJL, RJS, FILED.[2708114] [17-2832] |
Docket last updated: 11/21/2019 3:34 AM EST |
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant E. Virgil Conway, Jose Holguin-Veras, Donna J. Luh, Carlos Millan, Howard P. Milstein, New York State Thruway Authority, J. Donald Rice, Jr., Brandon R. Sall and Richard N. Simberg, FILED. [2123942] 17-2832 [Entered: 09/13/2017 04:41 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 24 pgs DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER, dated 04/14/2017, RECEIVED.[2124874] 17-2832 [Entered: 09/14/2017 03:40 PM] |