Cotto v. City of New York
Original Case: 1:15-cv-09123
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-02845 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Sep 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 13, 2020 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 17, 2020 4:28 AM EDT |
Defendant
Police Officer John Doe
|
|
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
City of New York
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
New York City Police Department
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Police Officer David J. Coote, An Officer of the 48th Precinct AKA Police Officer John Doe, Shield #019647
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Iris Cotto
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/17/2020 4:26 AM EDT |
Thursday, September 14, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Iris Cotto, FILED. [2124787] 17-2845 [Entered: 09/14/2017 03:05 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 8 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 27 pgs DISTRICT COURT OPINION, dated 08/11/2017, RECEIVED.[2124795] 17-2845 [Entered: 09/14/2017 03:08 PM] | |
3 | 3 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 08/14/2017, RECEIVED.[2124799] 17-2845 [Entered: 09/14/2017 03:08 PM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2124811] 17-2845 [Entered: 09/14/2017 03:10 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 8 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |