Ronnie Van Zant, Inc. v. Artimus Pyle
Original Case: 1:17-cv-03360
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-02849 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Case Filed: | Sep 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 10, 2018 |
Last checked: Friday Oct 12, 2018 4:33 AM EDT |
Amicus Curiae
The Tully Center for Free Speech
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
The Association of American Publishers, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Discovery Communications LLC
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Dow Jones & Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
First Amendment Coalition
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
First Look Media Works, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
The International Documentary Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
The Investigative Reporting Workshop
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
MPA - the Association of Magazine Media
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
The National Press Photographers Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Association of Alternative Newsmedia
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
A&E Television Networks, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Home Box Office, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Metro-Goldwyn-Mayer Studios Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
NBCUniversal Media, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Paramount Pictures Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Univision Communications Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
The Associated Press Media Editors
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
American Society of News Editors
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jane Doe
|
|
Defendant
DEF
|
|
Defendant
Artimus Pyle, AKA Thomas D. Pyle
|
|
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Defendant
XYZ Corporation
|
|
Defendant
XYZ LLZ, (the names of the last four defendants being fictitious and unknown to plaintiffs, and intended to be designate persons or entities that have or may have a role in the production and distribution of the Motion Picture compained of in the Complaint
|
|
Defendant - Appellant
Cleopatra Records, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Cleopatra Films, a division of Cleopatra Records, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ABC
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Corinna Gaines Biemiller, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of STEVEN GAINES
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Corinna Biemiller, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of STEVEN GAINES
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Alicia Rapp, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of STEVEN GAINES
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Barbara Houston, as the Trustee of the ALLEN COLLINS TRUST
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Johnny Van Zant
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Gary R. Rossington
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Ronnie Van Zant, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10/12/2018 4:29 AM EDT |
Thursday, September 14, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Cleopatra Films and Cleopatra Records, Inc, FILED. [2125046] 17-2849 [Entered: 09/14/2017 04:54 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 13 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 3 pgs DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 09/13/2017, RECEIVED.[2125062] 17-2849 [Entered: 09/14/2017 05:00 PM] | |
3 | 3 3 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 09/13/2017, RECEIVED.[2125063] 17-2849 [Entered: 09/14/2017 05:01 PM] | |
4 | 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Cleopatra Films and Cleopatra Records, Inc, district court receipt # 0208-14127213, FILED.[2125066] 17-2849 [Entered: 09/14/2017 05:02 PM] | |
5 | 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2125067] 17-2849 [Entered: 09/14/2017 05:02 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 11 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |