Uber Technologies, Inc. v. Fetch Media, Ltd.
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-05393 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Sep 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 03, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Mar 17, 2018 1:43 AM PDT |
Defendant
Fetch Media, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Uber Technologies, Inc.
1455 Market St. 4th Fl
San Francisco, CA 94103 |
Represented By
|
1. | Uber Goes on Rare Legal Offensive, Suing Ad Agency for Fraud (bloomberg.com) |
Submitted Mon 09/18/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, January 11, 2018 | ||
36 | 36 ORDER DENYING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED re 33 MOTION to Relate Cases 17-cv-5393-YGR and 18-cv-00015-WHA filed by Fetch Media, Ltd. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/11/2018. (fs, COURT STAFF) | |
Wednesday, January 10, 2018 | ||
35 | 35 Statement of Non-Opposition to Fetch's Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Shively, Ashley) | |
Wednesday, January 03, 2018 | ||
34 | 34 ORDER re 32 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Uber Technologies, Inc., ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/3/2018. (fs, COURT STAFF) | |
33 | 33 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Fetch Media, Ltd..(Olivar, Harry) | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, December 22, 2017 | ||
32 | 32 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Uber Technologies, Inc. (Shively, Ashley) | |
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
31 | 31 ADR Clerk's Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order (ewh, COURT STAFF) | |
Monday, December 18, 2017 | ||
30 | 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fetch Media, Ltd. re27 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Greenberg, Alyssa) | |
29 | 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Alyssa L Greenberg on behalf of Defendant Fetch Media, Ltd. (Greenberg, Alyssa) | |
28 | 28 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and 9(b) filed by Fetch Media, Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 1/2/2018. Replies due by 1/9/2018.(Olivar, Harry) | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
27 | 27 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Fetch Media, Ltd..(Olivar, Harry) | |
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Redacted Version of Motion to Dismiss, | ||
Att: 4 Unredacted Version of Motion to Dismiss | ||
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
26 | 26 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 1/1/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for MONDAY, 1/8/2018 02:00 PM before Judge Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. (fs, COURT STAFF) | |
Att: 1 Standing Order | ||
Thursday, December 07, 2017 | ||
25 | 25 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case Reassigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/7/17. (as, COURT STAFF) | |
24 | 24 Certificate of Interested Entities by Fetch Media, Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent Dentsu Aegis Network Ltd. for Fetch Media, Ltd.. (Olivar, Harry) | |
Wednesday, December 06, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Wed 12/06 1:48 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shyS, COURT STAFF) |
|
22 | 22
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Wed 12/06 12:51 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Fetch Media, Ltd... (Olivar, Harry) |
|
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 12/06 12:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Harry Arthur Olivar, Jr (Olivar, Harry) |
|
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 12/06 11:42 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by David Morad Elihu (Elihu, David) |
|
Tuesday, December 05, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Case Management Statement
Tue 12/05 9:33 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Shively, Ashley) |
|
Monday, December 04, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 12/04 12:49 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. Service waived by Fetch Media, Ltd. waiver sent on 9/18/2017, answer due 12/18/2017. (Shively, Ashley) (Filed on 12/4/2017) |
|
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
2
pgs
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 11/21 4:21 PM
NOTICE by Uber Technologies, Inc. : Notice of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding (Shively, Ashley) (Filed on 11/21/2017) |
|
16 | 16
2
pgs
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Tue 11/21 4:19 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Uber Technologies, Inc... (Shively, Ashley) (Filed on 11/21/2017) |
|
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Wed 10/11 2:53 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE: The Initial Case Management Conference is rescheduled to 12/12/2017 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. The Case Management Statement is due by 12/5/2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2017) |
|
Monday, October 02, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Mon 10/02 3:06 PM
ORDER Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting 13 Application.(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2017) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Mon 10/02 5:35 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice KERI S. BRUCE ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11762465.) filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Bruce, Keri) (Filed on 10/2/2017) |
|
Thursday, September 28, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Thu 09/28 12:09 PM
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Anthony J. Ford by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: Granting 9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2017) |
|
Wednesday, September 27, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 09/27 1:59 PM
ORDER Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting 8 Application. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2017) |
|
10 | 10
5
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Wed 09/27 1:55 PM
***PLEASE DISREGARD THIS DOCKET ENTERY AS IT WAS FILED IN ERROR*** ORDER Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting 8 Application. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2017) Modified on 9/27/2017 (shyS, COURT STAFF) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Wed 09/27 10:31 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ANTHONY J. FORD ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11751949.) filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Ford, Anthony) (Filed on 9/27/2017) |
|
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Mon 09/25 11:15 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice MARK S. MELODIA ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11744132.) filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Melodia, Mark) (Filed on 9/25/2017) |
|
Tuesday, September 19, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Tue 09/19 9:44 AM
Summons Issued as to Fetch Media, Ltd. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2017) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Tue 09/19 9:42 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/12/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2017 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 9/18/17. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2017) |
|
5 | 5
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Mon 09/18 5:09 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/2/2017. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2017) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Mon 09/18 3:37 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Uber Technologies, Inc. (Bovich, John) (Filed on 9/18/2017) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Summons
Mon 09/18 3:34 PM
Proposed Summons. (Bovich, John) (Filed on 9/18/2017) |
|
2 | 2
4
pgs
motion
Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
Mon 09/18 3:30 PM
Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Complaint and Exhibits filed by Uber Technologies, Inc..(Bovich, John) (Filed on 9/18/2017) |
|
Att: 1 3 pgs Declaration of John P. Bovich, | ||
Att: 2 33 pgs REDACTED Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 UNREDACTED Complaint, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit A - Under Seal, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit B - Under Seal, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit C - Under Seal, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit D - Under Seal, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit E - Under Seal, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit F - Under Seal, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit G - Under Seal, | ||
Att: 11 Proposed Order | ||
1 | 1
33
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 09/18 3:10 PM
REDATED VERSION COMPLAINT against Fetch Media, Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11726041.). Filed by Uber Technologies, Inc..(Bovich, John) (Filed on 9/18/2017) Modified on 9/18/2017 (cv, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 1 pgs Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 1 pgs Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet |