Stratton v. Secretary, Department of Corrections et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Marcia Morales Howard |
Referred: | James R Klindt |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00962 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Sep 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 07, 2020 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 07, 2020 | ||
48 | 48
order
Judgment
Tue 04/07 12:11 PM
JUDGMENT pursuant to this Court's Order entered on 4/7/2020, judgment is hereby entered the Petition (Doc. 1) is denied, and this case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 4/7/2020. (PAM) |
|
47 | 47
27
pgs
order
Order dismissing case
Tue 04/07 11:22 AM
ORDER denying 1 Petition and dismissing case with prejudice, with instructions to the Clerk. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 4/7/2020. (ACT) |
|
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
46 | 46
respoth
Response
Fri 02/28 9:43 AM
AMENDED Reply re22 Response to habeas petition filed by David Stratton.(RH) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix A, | ||
Att: 2 Appendix B, | ||
Att: 3 Appendix C, | ||
Att: 4 Appendix D, | ||
Att: 5 Appendix E, | ||
Att: 6 Appendix F | ||
45 | 45
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Amend / Correct / Modify / Supplement Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
Wed 02/26 9:05 AM
ORDER denying as moot 43 Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Amend Petitioner's Reply; granting 44 Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Amend Petitioner's Amended Reply; directions to the Clerk. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 2/25/2020. (CAW) |
|
Monday, December 23, 2019 | ||
44 | 44
motion
Leave to File Document
Mon 12/23 5:25 PM
MOTION for leave to amend petitioner's amended reply to state's amended answer in response to an order to show cause by David Stratton.(RH) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Appendix A, | ||
Att: 3 Appendix B, | ||
Att: 4 Appendix C, | ||
Att: 5 Appendix D, | ||
Att: 6 Appendix E, | ||
Att: 7 Appendix F | ||
Thursday, November 14, 2019 | ||
43 | 43
motion
Amend/Correct
Fri 11/15 12:51 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct27 Reply by David Stratton.(RH) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Appendix A, | ||
Att: 3 Appendix B, | ||
Att: 4 Appendix C, | ||
Att: 5 Appendix D, | ||
Att: 6 Appendix E, | ||
Att: 7 Appendix F | ||
Tuesday, May 28, 2019 | ||
42 | 42
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 05/28 4:21 PM
ORDER denying without prejudice 41 Motion for Evidentiary Hearing. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 5/28/2019. (ACT) |
|
Thursday, May 09, 2019 | ||
41 | 41
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 05/10 12:03 PM
MOTION for evidentiary hearing by David Stratton.(RH) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix A, | ||
Att: 2 Appendix B, | ||
Att: 3 Appendix C | ||
Monday, April 29, 2019 | ||
40 | 40
notice
Notice of inquiry
Tue 04/30 2:53 PM
NOTICE of inquiry by David Stratton (RH) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2019 | ||
39 | 39
3
pgs
order
Order on motion to supplement
Wed 03/27 8:23 AM
ORDER denying 36 Motion to supplement. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 3/25/2019. (ACT) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2019 | ||
38 | 38
answer
Response to habeas petition
Thu 03/21 12:30 PM
RESPONSE to 1 Petition for writ of habeas corpus by Secretary, Department of Corrections.(Moore, Jennifer) |
|
Monday, March 11, 2019 | ||
37 | 37
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 03/12 9:55 AM
NOTICE to the Court by David Stratton (RH) |
|
Monday, February 25, 2019 | ||
36 | 36
motion
Supplement
Wed 02/27 9:33 AM
AMENDED MOTION to supplement the record by David Stratton.(RH) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix A, | ||
Att: 2 Appendix B, | ||
Att: 3 Appendix C | ||
35 | 35
1
pgs
order
Order on motion to supplement Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Mon 02/25 4:24 PM
ORDER granting 33 Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Amend Motion to Supplement the Record; Respondents shall file a response to Petitioner's Amended Motion to Expand the Record by 3/25/2019; directions to the Clerk. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 2/25/2019. (CAW) |
|
Friday, February 22, 2019 | ||
34 | 34
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 02/22 2:28 PM
NOTICE to the Court by David Stratton (RH) |
|
Wednesday, February 20, 2019 | ||
33 | 33
motion
Amend/Correct
Thu 02/21 9:03 AM
MOTION to Amend/Correct31 MOTION to supplement the record by David Stratton.(RH) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Appendix A, | ||
Att: 3 Appendix B, | ||
Att: 4 Appendix C | ||
Thursday, February 14, 2019 | ||
32 | 32
1
pgs
order
Order directing response to motion
Thu 02/14 7:57 AM
ORDER directing Respondents to respond to 31 Petitioner's Motion to Supplement the Record by 2/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 2/13/2019. (CAW) |
|
Thursday, February 07, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Supplement
Mon 02/11 12:50 PM
MOTION to supplement the record by David Stratton.(RH) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix A, | ||
Att: 2 Appendix B, | ||
Att: 3 Appendix C | ||
Thursday, November 29, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
2
pgs
order
Order on motion for discovery
Thu 11/29 9:23 AM
ORDER denying 25 motion for discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 11/26/2018. (ACT) |
|
Monday, November 19, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
respm
Response to motion
Mon 11/19 11:44 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re25 MOTION for Discovery filed by Florida Attorney General. (Moore, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, November 13, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 11/13 3:21 PM
ORDER deeming withdrawn 23 , 24 Petitioner's Motion for an Extension of Time and Petitioner's Motion for an Order; directing Respondents to file a response to 25 Petitioner's Motion for Discovery by 11/19/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 11/9/2018. (CAW) |
|
Monday, November 05, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
respoth
Response
Wed 11/07 12:01 PM
RESPONSE re22 Response to habeas petition filed by David Stratton.(RH) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix A, | ||
Att: 2 Appendix B, | ||
Att: 3 Appendix C, | ||
Att: 4 Appendix D | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 11/07 11:28 AM
NOTICE by David Stratton to disregard re23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to21 Order on motion for discoveryOrder on Motion for HearingOrder on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,24 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for an Order requiring the Department of Corrections to mail petitioner his property containing his legal matters (RH) |
|
25 | 25
motion
Discovery
Wed 11/07 9:56 AM
MOTION for Discovery by David Stratton. (RH) |
|
Tuesday, October 23, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 10/25 3:14 PM
MOTION for an Order requiring the Department of Corrections to mail petitioner his property containing his legal matters by David Stratton. (RH) |
|
23 | 23
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 10/25 3:12 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to21 Order on motion for discoveryOrder on Motion for HearingOrder on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by David Stratton. (RH) |
|
Monday, September 24, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
answer
Response to habeas petition
Mon 09/24 8:47 AM
RESPONSE to 1 Petition for writ of habeas corpus by Florida Attorney General.(Moore, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit | ||
Friday, August 31, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
2
pgs
order
Order on motion for discovery Order on Motion for Hearing Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 08/31 3:55 PM
ORDER denying without prejudice 18 motion for discovery; denying without prejudice 19 Motion for Hearing; granting 20 Motion to the extent that Respondents shall file an amended response by September 24, 2018. After Respondents file their amended response, Petitioner, within ninety days, shall file a reply or notify the Court that he does not intend to file a reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 8/31/2018. (JND) |
|
Monday, August 20, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 08/22 4:21 PM
MOTION for an Order requiring the State to furnish the missing materials in their answer in response to an Order to Show Cause by David Stratton.(RH) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix A, | ||
Att: 2 Appendix B, | ||
Att: 3 Appendix C | ||
19 | 19
motion
Hearing
Wed 08/22 4:15 PM
MOTION for an Evidentiary Hearing by David Stratton. (RH) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Discovery
Wed 08/22 4:00 PM
MOTION for Discovery by David Stratton.(RH) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix A, | ||
Att: 2 Appendix B, | ||
Att: 3 Appendix C | ||
Wednesday, July 25, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Response to order to show cause
Wed 07/25 12:37 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re4 Order filed by Florida Attorney General.(Moore, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit | ||
Thursday, July 05, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 07/05 10:37 AM
ORDER denying as moot "motion for fact development procedures" 15 . Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 7/3/2018. (JND) |
|
Thursday, June 28, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 06/28 2:56 PM
MOTION for Fact Development Procedures by David Stratton.(BD) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix A | ||
14 | 14
respoth
Response
Thu 06/28 2:51 PM
RESPONSE to State's11 Motion to Dismiss filed by David Stratton. (BD) (BD). Modified on 6/28/2018 to regenerate NEF (BD) |
|
Att: 1 (6/28/2018) Appendix A | ||
Friday, June 22, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 06/26 11:38 AM
NOTICE to the Court that Petitioner will file a response to State's motion to dismiss by David Stratton (RH) |
|
Tuesday, June 12, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
order
*Order pdf
Tue 06/12 10:43 AM
ORDER denying Respondents' motion to dismiss 11 . By July 26, 2018, Respondents shall file a supplemental response addressing the petition on the merits. After Respondents file their supplemental response, Petitioner, within 90 days, shall file a reply or notify the Court that he does not intend to file reply. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 6/12/2018. (JND) |
|
Wednesday, June 06, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Response to habeas petition
Wed 06/06 11:55 AM
RESPONSE to 1 Petition for writ of habeas corpus by Secretary, Department of Corrections.(Moore, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 | ||
Thursday, May 31, 2018 | ||
utility
Set/reset deadlines/hearings-PUBLIC
Thu 05/31 12:07 PM
Set/reset deadlines/hearings: Response to petition due by 6/6/2018. (RH) |
||
Tuesday, May 29, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order on motion to extend time
Tue 05/29 2:54 PM
ORDER granting 9 Respondents' Third Motion for Extension of Time; response due by 6/6/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 5/25/2018. (CAW) |
|
Monday, May 07, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extend time
Mon 05/07 1:30 PM
Third MOTION to extend time to June 6, 2018 by Florida Attorney General. (Moore, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, April 18, 2018 | ||
utility
Set/reset deadlines/hearings-PUBLIC
Wed 04/18 10:24 AM
Set/reset deadlines/hearings: Response to petition due by 5/7/2018. (RH) |
||
Monday, April 16, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order on motion to extend time
Mon 04/16 3:48 PM
ORDER granting 7 Respondents' Second Motion for Enlargement of Time; response due by 5/7/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 4/13/2018. (CAW) |
|
Friday, March 23, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extend time
Fri 03/23 12:02 PM
Second MOTION to extend time to May 7th, 2018 by Secretary, Department of Corrections. (Moore, Jennifer) |
|
Monday, February 12, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order on motion to extend time
Mon 02/12 1:35 PM
ORDER granting 5 Respondents' First Motion for Enlargement of Time; response due by 3/23/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 2/9/2018. (CAW) |
|
utility
Set/reset deadlines/hearings-PUBLIC
Mon 02/12 4:00 PM
Set/reset deadlines/hearings: Response to petition due by 3/23/2018. (RH) |
||
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extend time
Mon 01/22 1:31 PM
First MOTION to extend time to March 23, 2018 by Secretary, Department of Corrections. (Moore, Jennifer) |
|
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
8
pgs
order
Order
Mon 10/23 1:38 PM
ORDER to respond and show cause why the petition should not be granted. Petitioner has 90 days to reply to the petition response. Clerk is directed to electronically serve the petition (Duval County). Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 11/13/2013. (CAW) |
|
Thursday, October 12, 2017 | ||
misc
Fees paid
Thu 10/12 12:48 PM
FEES paid by David Stratton (Filing fee $5 receipt number JAX025482) Balance due $0. (TMC) |
||
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 09/25 11:36 AM
ORDER directing Petitioner to pay the filing fee or file an affidavit of indigency by 10/25/2017; directions to the Clerk. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 9/22/2017. (CAW) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
order
Related case order and track 1 notice
Wed 09/20 4:52 PM
NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 9/20/2017. (JW) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for writ of habeas corpus
Mon 09/18 4:35 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus -State filed by David Stratton. (3 service copies, postmarked 9/5/17, no IFP)(RH) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix A, | ||
Att: 2 Appendix B, | ||
Att: 3 Appendix C, | ||
Att: 4 Appendix D, | ||
Att: 5 Appendix E, | ||
Att: 6 Appendix F, | ||
Att: 7 Appendix G, | ||
Att: 8 Appendix H |