Badhouse Studios, LLC v. Doe-74.65.247.93 et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Edgardo Ramos |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-07071 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Sep 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 12, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Mar 17, 2018 5:07 AM EDT |
Defendant
Doe-108.6.15.135
|
|
Defendant
Doe-158.222.147.146
|
|
Defendant
Doe-24.103.44.72
|
|
Defendant
Doe-67.245.175.11
|
|
Defendant
Doe-69.121.181.58
|
|
Defendant
Doe-71.183.40.114
|
|
Defendant
Doe-72.69.207.189
|
|
Defendant
Doe-72.80.105.235
|
|
Defendant
Doe-74.65.247.93
|
|
Defendant
Doe-74.66.241.162
|
|
Defendant
Doe-74.71.52.96
|
|
Defendant
Doe-96.246.185.196
|
|
Defendant
Doe-98.15.168.97
|
|
Plaintiff
Badhouse Studios, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/21/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, March 12, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
misc
AO 121 Form Copyright - Case Terminated - Submitted
Tue 03/13 10:05 AM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE TERMINATED- SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 3/12/2018 in a court action filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (rjm) |
|
13 | 13
order
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Signed
Tue 03/13 9:47 AM
NOTICE DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A), please take notice that the within action is dismissed without prejudice as to all remaining defendants. Plaintiff wishes to dismiss this case due in part to its current consideration of significant changes and improvements to its anti-piracy campaign and related efforts. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 3/12/2018) (rjm) |
|
Friday, December 08, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Fri 12/08 10:03 AM
ORDER granting11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Service due by 3/19/2018. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo) |
|
Wednesday, December 06, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time
Wed 12/06 6:09 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time Within Which to Serve the Complaint addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Bryan N. DeMatteo dated December 6, 2017. Document filed by Badhouse Studios, LLC.(DeMatteo, Bryan) |
|
Wednesday, October 25, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Discovery
Wed 10/25 5:52 PM
ORDER granting9 Letter Motion for Discovery: The Court hereby ORDERS that Badhouse Studios, LLC ("Plaintiff") may immediatelyserve a Rule 45 subpoena on the ISP of the subscriber assigned IP address 98.15.168.97(hereafter "Subscriber") to obtain information to identify the Subscriber, specifically his or hername, current and permanent address. Plaintiff is expressly not permitted to subpoena the ISP forthe Subscriber's email addresses or telephone numbers, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 10/25/2017) (jwh) |
|
Tuesday, October 24, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Discovery
Tue 10/24 1:40 PM
LETTER MOTION for Discovery / for Entry of Proposed Discovery Order addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Bryan N. DeMatteo dated October 24, 2017. Document filed by Badhouse Studios, LLC.(DeMatteo, Bryan) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, October 19, 2017 | ||
minutes
Pre-Motion Conference
Thu 10/19 6:25 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edgardo Ramos: Pre-Motion Conference held on 10/19/2017. Plaintiff's counsel present. Plaintiff granted leave to serve a Rule 45 subpoena to obtain limited discovery from the Internet Service Provider. (Court Reporter Vincent Bologna) (jar) |
||
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Discovery
Fri 09/22 3:30 PM
ORDER terminating7 Letter Motion for Discovery. A pre-motion conference will be held on October 19, 2017 at 10:30 am. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo) Modified on 9/22/2017 (jar) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Fri 09/22 3:31 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Pre-Motion Conference set for 10/19/2017 at 10:30 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos. (jar) |
||
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Discovery
Thu 09/21 2:12 PM
LETTER MOTION for Discovery / for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Bryan N. DeMatteo dated September 21, 2017. Document filed by Badhouse Studios, LLC.(DeMatteo, Bryan) |
|
6 | 6
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 09/21 1:12 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint, against Doe-98.15.168.97 with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Badhouse Studios, LLC. Related document:1 Complaint,.(DeMatteo, Bryan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit IP Address, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Copyright Registration | ||
Tuesday, September 19, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
AO 121 Form Copyright - Case Opening - Submitted
Tue 09/19 10:16 AM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (rch) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Tue 09/19 10:19 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (rch) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Tue 09/19 10:19 AM
Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (rch) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Tue 09/19 10:19 AM
Case Designated ECF. (rch) |
||
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 09/18 10:00 AM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Badhouse Studios, LLC.(DeMatteo, Bryan) |
|
3 | 3
misc
AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney
Mon 09/18 9:58 AM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(DeMatteo, Bryan) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 09/18 9:56 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (DeMatteo, Bryan) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 09/18 9:53 AM
COMPLAINT against Doe-108.6.15.135, Doe-158.222.147.146, Doe-24.103.44.72, Doe-67.245.175.11, Doe-69.121.181.58, Doe-71.183.40.114, Doe-72.69.207.189, Doe-72.80.105.235, Doe-74.65.247.93, Doe-74.66.241.162, Doe-74.71.52.96, Doe-96.246.185.196, Doe-98.15.168.97. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14136925)Document filed by Badhouse Studios, LLC.(DeMatteo, Bryan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit IP Addresses, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Copyright Registration |