Meadors v. Ulster County
Original Case: 1:09-cv-00550
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-02863 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Sep 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 29, 2020 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 31, 2020 4:28 AM EDT |
Amicus Curiae
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Richard J. Bockelmann, in his official capacity as Sheriff of the County of Ulster and individually
|
|
Defendant
Bradford Ebel, in his official capacity as Superintendent of the Ulster County Jail and individually
|
|
Defendant
Ray Acevedo, in his official capacity as Deputy Superintendent of Ulster County Jail and individually
|
|
Defendant - Appellant
Paul J. VanBlarcum, in his official capacity as Sheriff of the County of Ulster, and individually
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Ulster County
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia Meadors
|
|
Plaintiff
Nancy Reyes
|
|
Plaintiff
Ann Marie Legg
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Ulster County
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Patricia Watson
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Oct 29 2020
OPINION, affirming in part, vacating in part and remanding to the district court, by PWH, GEL, SLC, FILED.[2962951] [17-2861, 17-2863] |
Docket last updated: 10/31/2020 4:24 AM EDT |
Thursday, September 14, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Ulster County and Paul J. VanBlarcum, FILED. [2125686] 17-2863 [Entered: 09/15/2017 01:01 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 55 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 26 pgs DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER, dated 08/24/2017, RECEIVED.[2125690] 17-2863 [Entered: 09/15/2017 01:03 PM] | |
3 | 3 2 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 08/29/2017, RECEIVED.[2125691] 17-2863 [Entered: 09/15/2017 01:04 PM] | |
4 | 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Ulster County and Paul J. VanBlarcum, district court receipt # 0206-4133845, FILED.[2125695] 17-2863 [Entered: 09/15/2017 01:05 PM] | |
6 | 6 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2125699] 17-2863 [Entered: 09/15/2017 01:06 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 24 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |