PERALTA v. HOME DEPOT U.S.A. INC.
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Jose L Linares |
Referred: | Joseph A Dickson |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-07244 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1446 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Sep 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 12, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Mar 18, 2018 4:52 AM EDT |
Defendant
ABC CORP
|
|
Defendant
HOME DEPOT U.S.A.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JANE ROE 1-X
|
|
Defendant
JOHN DOE 1-X
|
|
Notice Only
arbnwk
|
|
Plaintiff
CESAR H. PERALTA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Monday, October 22, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
order
Stipulation and Order
Tue 10/23 2:41 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER Dismissing Case with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 10/22/2018. (km) |
|
Thursday, October 18, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 10/18 11:52 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by HOME DEPOT U.S.A.. (WONG, LINDA) |
|
Wednesday, September 12, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order 60-Day Administrative Termination
Wed 09/12 10:10 AM
Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 11/12/2018. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 9/10/18. (cm, ) |
|
Monday, September 10, 2018 | ||
minutes
Settlement Conference
Mon 09/10 12:44 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson: Settlement Conference held on 9/10/2018. Case settled. 60 day order to be entered. (nm, ) |
||
Wednesday, July 25, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/25 3:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by CORRYN LYNN KRONNAGEL on behalf of HOME DEPOT U.S.A. (KRONNAGEL, CORRYN) |
|
Monday, June 25, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order
Mon 06/25 10:48 AM
TEXT ORDER: The parties are advised that the in person settlement conference scheduled for 8/15/18 has been rescheduled to 9/10/18 at 10:30 a.m.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 6/25/18. (nm, ) |
|
Thursday, May 31, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order
Thu 05/31 10:08 AM
TEXT ORDER: Fact discovery extended to 7/31/18. In person settlement conference scheduled for 8/15/18 at 10:30 a.m. All parties with FULL settlement authority are required to attend. Confidential settlement position letters of five (5) pages or less are to be faxed to chambers (973-645-4549) by 8/10/18.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 5/31/18. (nm, ) |
|
minutes
Status Conference
Thu 05/31 9:55 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson: Telephone Status Conference held on 5/31/2018. (nm, ) |
||
Thursday, May 24, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order
Thu 05/24 3:50 PM
TEXT ORDER: Per the request of counsel and with consent, the telephone status conference scheduled for 5/29/18 has been rescheduled to 5/31/18 at 9:45 a.m. Counsel for plaintiff is to initiate the call to 973-645-2580.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 5/24/18. (nm, ) |
|
Friday, March 09, 2018 | ||
minutes
Status Conference
Fri 03/09 10:01 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson: Telephone Status Conference held on 3/9/2018. Telephone status conference scheduled for 5/29/18 at 10:30 a.m. Counsel for plaintiff is to initiate the call to 973-645-2580. (nm, ) |
||
Thursday, February 01, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order
Thu 02/01 10:10 AM
TEXT ORDER: The parties are advised that the telephone status conference scheduled for 3/7/18 has been rescheduled to 3/9/18 at 9:45 a.m.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 2/1/18. (nm, ) |
|
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order
Mon 01/22 2:49 PM
TEXT ORDER: Per the request of counsel and with consent, the telephone status conference scheduled for 2/27/18 has been rescheduled to 3/7/18 at 2:30 p.m.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 1/22/18. (nm, ) |
|
Wednesday, December 27, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Discovery Confidentiality Order
Wed 12/27 2:23 PM
Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 12/27/17. (DD, ) |
|
Friday, December 22, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Affidavit
Fri 12/22 10:48 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Linda Wong by HOME DEPOT U.S.A..(WONG, LINDA) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Confidentiality Order | ||
Friday, December 15, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 12/15 1:58 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone/Status Conference set for 2/27/2018 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson. Amended Pleadings due by 3/30/2018. Fact Discovery due by 5/31/2018. Joinder of Parties due by 3/30/2018; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 12/15/17. (DD, ) |
|
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Fri 12/15 10:15 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson: Initial Pretrial Conference held via telephone on 12/15/2017. (nm, ) |
||
Friday, December 08, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order
Fri 12/08 2:21 PM
TEXT ORDER - The telephonic initial conference scheduled for 12/12/17 is adjourned to 12/15/17 at 9:30 a.m. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the call to chambers (973-645-2580).. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 12/8/17. (nm, ) |
|
Friday, December 01, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
discov
Joint Discovery Plan
Fri 12/01 1:16 PM
Joint Discovery Plan by HOME DEPOT U.S.A..(WONG, LINDA) |
|
Tuesday, November 28, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order
Tue 11/28 10:46 AM
TEXT ORDER: The parties are advised that the R16 conference scheduled for 12/11/17 has been rescheduled to 12/12/17 at 10:30 a.m. and will be conducted by telephone. Counsel for plaintiff is to initiate the call to 973-645-2580.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 11/28/17. (nm, ) |
|
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
4
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Mon 10/23 8:44 AM
ORDER: Initial Conference set for 12/11/2017 11:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 2D before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/23/17. (nm, ) |
|
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 10/10 11:18 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by HOME DEPOT U.S.A..(WONG, LINDA) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
utility
Update Answer Due Deadline
Mon 09/25 2:14 PM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by HOME DEPOT U.S.A. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/10/17. (DD, ) |
||
Tuesday, September 19, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order
Tue 09/19 4:16 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (WONG, LINDA) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 09/19 4:07 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by HOME DEPOT U.S.A. INC. identifying No Corporate Parent as Corporate Parent.. (WONG, LINDA) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 09/19 3:48 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by HOME DEPOT U.S.A. INC. from Superior Court of Middlesex County, case number MID-L-3797-17. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8099254), filed by HOME DEPOT U.S.A. INC..(WONG, LINDA) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 09/20 10:21 AM
Case Assigned to Chief Judge Jose L. Linares and Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson. (ak, ) |
||
utility
Case Referred to Arbitration
Wed 09/20 10:22 AM
CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (ak, ) |