North American Soccer League, LLC v. United States Soccer Federation, Inc.
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Brian M Cogan |
Referred: | Steven Tiscione |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-05495 |
Nature of Suit | 410 Other Statutes - Antitrust |
Cause | 15:1 Antitrust Litigation |
Case Filed: | Sep 19, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Mar 18, 2018 4:29 AM EDT |
Defendant
United States Soccer Federation, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Major League Soccer, L.L.C.
|
|
Plaintiff
North American Soccer League, LLC
|
Represented By
|
1. | NASL files antitrust lawsuit against the U.S. Soccer Federation (goal.com) |
Submitted Wed 09/20/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 79 minutes ago |
Wednesday, February 28, 2024 | ||
397 | 397
misc
Letter
Wed 02/28 2:07 PM
Letter to Hon. Brian M. Cogan from the parties regarding proposed pretrial schedule, pursuant to Order dated February 21, 2024 by North American Soccer League, LLC (Kessler, Jeffrey) |
|
Wednesday, February 21, 2024 | ||
396 | 396
motion
Compel
Wed 02/21 3:16 PM
Letter MOTION to Compel Meet and Confer to Set Pretrial Schedule, by North American Soccer League, LLC. (Kessler, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Correspondence Regarding Proposed Schedule | ||
order
Order on Motion to Compel
Wed 02/21 4:50 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part396 . The parties are ordered to submit separate proposals for a pretrial schedule by 2/28/2024. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/21/2024. (PW) |