Jonathan Ambrose Vanloan v. The Nation of Islam et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | R Gary Klausner |
Referred: | Alka Sagar |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-06912 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Sep 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 06, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Mar 18, 2018 2:24 AM PDT |
Defendant
LAPD Chief Charles L. Beck
|
|
Defendant
Louis Farrakhan
|
|
Defendant
Los Angeles Fire Department Does 1-9
|
|
Defendant
Los Angeles Police Department Does 1-9
|
|
Defendant
Los Angeles Police Department Officer Doe
|
|
Defendant
Los Angeles Police Department Officer Doe Danielson
|
|
Defendant
David Miscavige
|
|
Defendant
Tony Muhammad
|
|
Defendant
The Church of Scientology International
|
|
Defendant
The Church of Scientology of Inglewood
|
|
Defendant
The City of Los Angeles
|
|
Defendant
The Los Angeles Board of Police Commissioners
|
|
Defendant
The Nation of Islam
|
|
Plaintiff
Jonathan Ambrose Vanloan
4609 Highgrove Ave
Torrance, CA 90505 |
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Tuesday, July 10, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Mail Returned
Fri 07/13 12:44 PM
Mail Returned addressed to Jonathan Ambrose Vanloan re Order to Show Cause9 . (lom) |
|
Tuesday, February 06, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Wed 02/07 11:46 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Order re: Motion for Extension of Time in Which to Serve Defendants (DE 10). Plaintiff filed this action against Defendants on September 19, 2017. The Court issued a 21 Day Summons as to all Defendants on the same date. On December 19, 2017, the Court issued and OSC re Lack of Prosecution. On December 28, 2017, Plaintiff filed the current Motion for Extension of Time, seeking an additional 90 days to serve Defendants. Upon review of Plaintiff's arguments, and in light of the amount of time Plaintiff has already had to attempt service, the Court finds insufficient good cause to grant this motion. The Court denies Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bp) |
|
Monday, January 29, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 02/01 10:01 AM
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY BUSINESS OR CONTACT INFORMATION filed by Plaintiff Jonathan Ambrose Vanloan. (bp) |
|
Tuesday, January 23, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 01/23 9:08 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time in Which to Serve Defendants10 , calendared for hearing on January 29, 2018, has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) |
|
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 01/10 9:48 AM
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY BUSINESS OR CONTACT INFORMATION filed by Plaintiff Jonathan Ambrose Vanloan. (bp) |
|
Thursday, December 28, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Wed 01/03 3:30 PM
PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO SERVE DEFENDANTS filed by Plaintiff Jonathan Ambrose Vanloan. Motion set for hearing on 1/29/2018 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (pso) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration | ||
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Tue 12/19 1:25 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge R. Gary Klausner. The court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing on or before December 28, 2017 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the court finds that this matter is appropriate for submission without oral argument. The Order To Show Cause will stand submitted upon the filing of plaintiff's response. REFER TO THE COURT'S ORDER TO DETAILS. (pso) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Temporary Restraining Order
Wed 09/20 11:26 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) Order re: Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order (DE2 ) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court finds that Plaintiff has not satisfied the requisite burden warranting such relief. Therefore, the Court DENIES Plaintiff's request. (ah) |
|
6 | 6
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Wed 09/20 9:08 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES upon filing of the complaint by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (pso) |
|
Tuesday, September 19, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Thu 09/21 8:50 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery),,1 as to Defendants LAPD Chief Charles L. Beck, Los Angeles Fire Department Does 1-9, Los Angeles Police Department Does 1-9, Los Angeles Police Department Officer Doe, David Miscavige, Tony Muhammad, The Church of Scientology International, The Church of Scientology of Inglewood, The City of Los Angeles, The Los Angeles Board of Police Commissioners, The Nation of Islam, Jonathan Ambrose Vanloan.(jtil) |
|
Att: 1 LAPD, | ||
Att: 2 LA BPC, | ||
Att: 3 Church of Scientology, | ||
Att: 4 Tony Muhammad, | ||
Att: 5 Louis Farrakhan, | ||
Att: 6 DMiscavige, | ||
Att: 7 City of LA, | ||
Att: 8 The Church of Sci Inglewood, | ||
Att: 9 Nation of Islam, | ||
Att: 10 CBeck | ||
5 | 5
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 09/19 5:24 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 09/19 5:23 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (jtil) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 09/19 5:21 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jonathan Ambrose Vanloan. (jtil) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Temporary Restraining Order
Tue 09/19 5:19 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiff Jonathan Ambrose Vanloan. (jtil) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Tue 09/19 5:14 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Jonathan Ambrose Vanloan against Defendants LAPD Chief Charles L. Beck, Louis Farrakhan, Los Angeles Fire Department Does 1-9, Los Angeles Police Department Does 1-9, Los Angeles Police Department Officer Doe, Los Angeles Police Department Officer Doe Danielson, David Miscavige, Tony Muhammad, The Church of Scientology International, The Church of Scientology of Inglewood, The City of Los Angeles, The Los Angeles Board of Police Commissioners, The Nation of Islam. Case assigned to Judge R. Gary Klausner for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (Filing fee $ 400 Paid). (jtil) |
|
Att: 1 Part 2, | ||
Att: 2 Lodged Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 CV-71 |