F.L. v. Board of Education of the Grea
Original Case: 2:15-cv-05916
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-02881 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 448 Civil Rights - Education |
Case Filed: | Sep 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 24, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 28, 2018 4:35 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
The Board of Education of the Great Neck Union Free School District
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
T. D., individually and on behalf of
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
F. L., individually and on behalf of R.C.L.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
R. C.L.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 08/28/2018 4:34 AM EDT |
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant F. L. and R. C.L., FILED. [2127005] 17-2881 [Entered: 09/18/2017 02:45 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 6 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 08/21/2017, RECEIVED.[2127011] 17-2881 [Entered: 09/18/2017 02:47 PM] | |
3 | 3 30+ pgs DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 08/15/2017, RECEIVED.[2127013] 17-2881 [Entered: 09/18/2017 02:48 PM] | |
4 | 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant F. L. and R. C.L., district court receipt # 02079829516, FILED.[2127015] 17-2881 [Entered: 09/18/2017 02:49 PM] | |
5 | 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2127017] 17-2881 [Entered: 09/18/2017 02:49 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 6 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |