Reches v. Morgan Stanley & Co. Incorpora
Original Case: 1:16-cv-01663
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-02874 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Case Filed: | Sep 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 06, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 11, 2018 4:37 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Benjamin Reches
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2018 4:34 AM EDT |
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Benjamin Reches, FILED. [2126383] 17-2874 [Entered: 09/18/2017 09:24 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 6 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 2 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 08/23/2017, RECEIVED.[2126396] 17-2874 [Entered: 09/18/2017 09:28 AM] | |
4 | 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Benjamin Reches, district court receipt # 4653119395, FILED.[2126399] 17-2874 [Entered: 09/18/2017 09:29 AM] | |
5 | 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2126401] 17-2874 [Entered: 09/18/2017 09:30 AM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 5 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |