Dumont et al v. Lyon, et al
Michigan Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Paul D Borman |
Referred: | Elizabeth A Stafford |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-13080 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Sep 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 22, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 19, 2018 5:54 AM EDT |
Amicus
Arlan Meekhof
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Nick Lyon, in his official capacity only as Executive Director of the Michigan Department of Health and Human Services
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Herman McCall
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
Chad Buck
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
Melissa Buck
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
Shamber Flore
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
St. Vincent Catholic Charities
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Erin Busk-Sutton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rebecca Busk-Sutton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dana Dumont
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kristy Dumont
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer Ludolph
|
Represented By
|
1. | Michigan ACLU files lawsuit on behalf of two same sex adoptive couples who allege discrimination (wnem.com) |
Submitted Mon 09/25/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, February 22, 2022 | ||
99 | 99
2
pgs
order
Order Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Tue 02/22 12:10 PM
ORDER (1) Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Withdraw Plaintiffs' Motion to Reopen for Purposes of Enforcing the Settlement Agreement (ECF NO.98 ), and (2) Cancelling the February 23, 2022 Show Cause Hearing. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (KSan) |
|
98 | 98
motion
Withdraw
Tue 02/22 10:57 AM
MOTION to Withdraw87 MOTION to Reopen Case for Purposes of Enforcing Settlement Agreement by Erin Busk-Sutton, Rebecca Busk-Sutton, Dana Dumont, Kristy Dumont. (Ostrager, Ann-Elizabeth)[NOTICE OF WITHDRAW OF87 MOTION] Modified on 2/22/2022 (DPer) |
|
Tuesday, February 15, 2022 | ||
97 | 97
notice
Appear*
Tue 02/15 2:09 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: Hearing set for 2/23/2022 11:00 AM before District Judge Paul D. Borman |Zoom Webinar Information: https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1601278033?pwd=NGt4UVdyTG5nOFA3SkRaMTRnRmNydz09 Passcode: 136560 Or One tap mobile : US: +16692545252,,1601278033# or +16468287666,,1601278033#| (DTof) |
|
96 | 96
order
Show Cause
Tue 02/15 2:08 PM
ORDER to Show Cause why why Plaintiffs Motion to Reopen (ECF No. 87) should not be dismissed. Hearing set for 2/23/2022 11:00 AM before District Judge Paul D. Borman Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof) |