Walbridge v. Northeast Credit Union
New Hampshire District Court | |
Judge: | Joseph A Diclerico, Jr |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00434 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 15:1693 Electronic Funds Transfer Act |
Case Filed: | Sep 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 12, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 19, 2018 5:13 AM EDT |
Defendant
Northeast Credit Union
100 Borthwick Avenue
Portsmouth, NH 03801 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does 1 Through 100
|
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Walbridge
5 First Road
Milton, NH 03851 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Wednesday, December 12, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
order
Judgment
Wed 12/12 3:28 PM
JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with 22 Order on Motion to Dismiss, 26 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court. (Case Closed) (ko) |
|
Tuesday, December 11, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 12/11 5:15 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal as to case by Joseph Walbridge(Craig, Christine) |
|
Monday, December 03, 2018 | ||
notice
Case Settlement
Mon 12/03 9:17 AM
Christine Craig, Esq. advised case settled. Agreement for entry of judgment or a stipulation of dismissal to be filed within 30 days or the court will dismiss the case with prejudice. Case Settlement Deadline 1/2/2019. (ko) |
||
Thursday, May 24, 2018 | ||
notice
Hearing Notice
Thu 05/24 12:02 PM
NOTICE of Hearing. Discovery Status Conference set for 12/3/2018 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. At least 7 days prior to the date of the conference, the parties shall submit a joint statement regarding the status of discovery.(ko) |
||
Monday, May 07, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
order
Protective Order
Tue 05/08 9:55 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(ko) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Protective Order
Mon 05/07 11:18 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 24 Motion for Protective Order. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(gla) |
||
Friday, May 04, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Protective Order
Fri 05/04 3:21 PM
Assented to MOTION for Protective Order filed by Northeast Credit Union.(Hilliard, Russell) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A Proposed Protective Order | ||
Wednesday, March 21, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
12
pgs
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 03/21 1:51 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint - New Case filed by Northeast Credit Union.(Richter, Stuart) |
|
Wednesday, March 07, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
26
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Wed 03/07 11:31 AM
///ORDER granting in part and denying in part 8 Motion to Dismiss. Motion to dismiss is granted as to Claim 4 (unjust enrichment and restitution), Claim 5 (money had and received), and Claim 6 (violation of EFTA). The motion is otherwise denied. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(gla) |
|
Monday, February 12, 2018 | ||
notice
Trial Notice
Mon 02/12 4:08 PM
TRIAL NOTICE: Pretrial Statements due 7/30/2019. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 8/13/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/20/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Joseph A. DiClerico Jr. JERS Statement due 8/20/2019. Jury Selection/Trial set for two week period beginning 9/4/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Joseph A. DiClerico Jr. (ko) |
||
Friday, February 09, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
3
pgs
order
Order on Discovery Plan
Mon 02/12 3:57 PM
ORDER approving 20 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 10-14 days. Case Track: Standard. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Summary Judgment Motions due by 4/5/2019. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 11/15/2018.(ko) |
|
Thursday, February 08, 2018 | ||
minutes
Pretrial Conference
Thu 02/08 4:55 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 2/8/2018. Order to issue. (Pltfs Atty: Taras Kick, Christine Craig, Sean O'Connell) (Defts Atty: Stuart Richter, Russell Hilliard, Brooke Shilo)(Total Hearing Time: 22 min.) (kad) |
||
Friday, February 02, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Discovery Plan
Fri 02/02 4:14 PM
Proposed Discovery Plan of the Parties filed by Joseph Walbridge. (Craig, Christine) |
|
Monday, January 29, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Surreply to Reply
Mon 01/29 7:16 PM
SURREPLY to Reply to8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Joseph Walbridge.(Kick, Taras) |
|
Att: 1 Request for Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to Request for Judicial Notice, Courtesy Pay Agreement | ||
Wednesday, January 24, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Reply to Objection to Motion
Wed 01/24 3:40 PM
REPLY to Objection to Motion re8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Northeast Credit Union. Surreply due by 1/29/2018. (Hilliard, Russell) |
|
Wednesday, January 17, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
3
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Wed 01/17 12:05 AM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Joseph Walbridge. Follow up on Reply on 1/24/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Kick, Taras) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law, | ||
Att: 2 Request for Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 6 | ||
notice
ECF - Filing Error - Info Only
Wed 01/17 9:37 AM
NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re:17 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Joseph Walbridge. No description of exhibit or attachment was included. Exhibit or attachment shall be followed by a short description of the document and shall not exceed five words. AP 2.5(a). See[LINK:Properly Attach Exhibits to Pleadings in ECF] . NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423.(ko) |
||
Wednesday, January 10, 2018 | ||
notice
Pretrial Conference
Wed 01/10 2:02 PM
NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 2/8/2018 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Discovery Plan 2/2/2018. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(kad) |
||
Friday, January 05, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time
Fri 01/05 11:52 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 16 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to File Discovery Plan and Continue PreTrial Conference. Text of Order: Granted. Given the issues raised in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) to after the rescheduled pretrial conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(ko) |
||
Tuesday, January 02, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Extend Time
Tue 01/02 4:37 PM
Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to File Discovery Plan and Continue PreTrial Conference filed by Joseph Walbridge.(O'Connell, Sean) |
|
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 12/13 3:33 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 14 Assented to MOTION for Andrew J. Demko to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 15 Assented to MOTION for Stuart M. Richter to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Andrew J. Demko, Stuart M. Richter submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 12/26/2017.To access the online registration form, click HERE . Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click [LINK:HERE] .(ko) |
||
Monday, December 11, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 12/11 10:07 AM
Assented to MOTION for Stuart M. Richter to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1596028.) filed by Northeast Credit Union.(Hilliard, Russell) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit (Affidavit) 1 - Richter Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment to Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing | ||
14 | 14
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 12/11 10:04 AM
Assented to MOTION for Andrew J. Demko to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1596020.) filed by Northeast Credit Union.(Hilliard, Russell) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit (Affidavit) 1 - Demko Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment to Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing | ||
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond
Mon 12/11 10:18 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 13 Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond to 8 Motion to Dismiss. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. Follow up on Objection on 1/16/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(gla) |
||
Friday, December 08, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Extend Time to Object/Respond
Fri 12/08 11:38 AM
Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Object/Respond to8 MOTION to Dismiss to January 16, 2018 filed by Joseph Walbridge.(O'Connell, Sean) |
|
Thursday, December 07, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 12/07 3:15 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Richard D. McCune, Jae K. Kim, and Taras Hicks submit ECF registration forms within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 12/18/2017.To access the online registration form, click HERE . Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click [LINK:HERE] .(vln) |
||
Wednesday, December 06, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 12/06 2:11 PM
Assented to MOTION for Richard D. McCune to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1594545.) filed by Joseph Walbridge.(Craig, Christine) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit (Affidavit) A - Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Cert of Good Standing | ||
11 | 11
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 12/06 2:09 PM
Assented to MOTION for Jae K. Kim to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1594543.) filed by Joseph Walbridge.(Craig, Christine) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit (Affidavit) A-Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B -Cert of Good Standing | ||
10 | 10
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 12/06 2:05 PM
Assented to MOTION for Taras Kick to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1594540.) filed by Joseph Walbridge.(Craig, Christine) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit (Affidavit) A - Affidavit | ||
Tuesday, December 05, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Attorney Appearance
Tue 12/05 3:05 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brooke Lois Lovett Shilo on behalf of Northeast Credit Union Attorney Brooke Lois Lovett Shilo added to party Northeast Credit Union(pty:dft).(Lovett Shilo, Brooke) |
|
Monday, December 04, 2017 | ||
notice
Pretrial Conference
Mon 12/04 2:43 PM
NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 1/11/2018 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Discovery Plan 1/4/2018. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(kad) |
||
Thursday, November 30, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Dismiss
Thu 11/30 3:57 PM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by Northeast Credit Union. Follow up on Objection on 12/14/2017. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Hilliard, Russell) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 3 Attachment to Exhibit Ex 1 to Req for Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 4 Attachment to Exhibit Ex 2 to Req for Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit (Affidavit) Declaration of Michael Gagnon | ||
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time to Answer
Tue 10/10 3:44 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 7 Motion to Extend Time to Answer 1 Complaint. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. Answer Follow Up on 11/30/2017. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(gla) |
||
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extend Time to Answer
Fri 10/06 9:44 AM
Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to 11/30/2017 filed by Northeast Credit Union.(Hilliard, Russell) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Disclosure Statement
Fri 10/06 9:42 AM
Disclosure Statement by Northeast Credit Union disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Hilliard, Russell) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Attorney Appearance
Fri 10/06 9:41 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Russell F. Hilliard on behalf of Northeast Credit Union Attorney Russell F. Hilliard added to party Northeast Credit Union(pty:dft).(Hilliard, Russell) |
|
Thursday, September 28, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Return of Service Executed
Thu 09/28 3:18 PM
Return of Service Executed as to Northeast Credit Union by Joseph Walbridge. Served/Mailed on 9/25/2017. Answer Follow Up on 10/16/2017. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(O'Connell, Sean) |
|
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons - Waiver Issued
Thu 09/21 10:38 AM
Summons issued electronically as to Northeast Credit Union. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (lml) |
|
Att: 1 Notice ECF. | ||
2 | 2
notice
Attorney Appearance
Thu 09/21 8:02 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sean T. O'Connell on behalf of Joseph Walbridge Attorney Sean T. O'Connell added to party Joseph Walbridge(pty:pla).(O'Connell, Sean) |
|
notice
Notice - ECF
Thu 09/21 10:36 AM
NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click [LINK:HERE] . (lml) |
||
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
25
pgs
cmp
Complaint - New Case
Wed 09/20 3:29 PM
NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1563405 filed by Joseph Walbridge.(Craig, Christine) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons - Waiver | ||
utility
Case Assigned
Thu 09/21 10:34 AM
Case assigned to Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. The case designation is: 1:17-cv-434-JD. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (lml) |