Al Blowers v. Digiliti Money, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Fernando M Olguin |
Referred: | Jacqueline Chooljian |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-06949 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1446 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Sep 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 04, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 19, 2018 2:54 AM PDT |
Defendant
Digiliti Money, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jeffrey Mack
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Al Blowers
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, October 04, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120)
Wed 10/04 3:48 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing). (jp) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal | ||
17 | 17
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Wed 10/04 2:40 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Al Blowers. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Girard, Robert) |
|
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Fri 09/29 2:03 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) |
|
Thursday, September 28, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 09/29 5:54 PM
ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: granting12 Non-Resident Attorney Philip J. Kaplan APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Digiliti Money, Inc., designating David A. Senior as local counsel. (lt) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
textonly
Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail
Tue 09/26 2:16 PM
Notice of Electronic Filing re Transferring Case purs GO 16-05 (CV 34),11 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Philip J. Kaplan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Digiliti Money, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20566508)12 e-mailed to omar.bengali@ffslaw.com bounced due to 550 5.1.1 RESOLVER.ADR.RecipNotFound; not found. Primary e-mail address corrected. Notice of Electronic Filing resent addressed to obengali@girardbengali.com. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ew) |
|
13 | 13
textonly
Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail
Tue 09/26 2:14 PM
Notice of Electronic Filing re Transferring Case purs GO 16-05 (CV 34),11 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Philip J. Kaplan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Digiliti Money, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20566508)12 e-mailed to rjg@ffslaw.com bounced due to 550 5.1.1 RESOLVER.ADR.RecipNotFound; not found. Primary e-mail address corrected. Notice of Electronic Filing resent addressed to rgirard@girardbengali.com. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ew) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Tue 09/26 12:28 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Philip J. Kaplan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Digiliti Money, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20566508) filed by defendant Digiliti Money, Inc.. (Tria, Ann-Kathryn) |
|
Att: 1 P roposed Order | ||
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Transferring Case purs GO 16-05 (Related Case)(CV 34)
Mon 09/25 4:43 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:13-cv-01546 FMO(JCx). Case transferred from Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim to Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:17-cv-06949 FMO(JCx). Signed by Judge Fernando M. Olguin (rn) |
|
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
attorney
Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form
Thu 09/21 4:18 PM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Philip J Kaplan. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et) |
|
9 | 9
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 09/21 4:10 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 09/21 4:10 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (et) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Wed 09/20 4:11 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Digiliti Money, Inc., re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Notice of Related Case(s)5 , Corporate Disclosure Statement3 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties4 , Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification)(AO 120)6 served on September 20, 2017. (Tria, Ann-Kathryn) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120)
Wed 09/20 4:07 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Digiliti Money, Inc.. (Tria, Ann-Kathryn) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Related Case(s)
Wed 09/20 4:05 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by defendant Digiliti Money, Inc.. Related Case(s): 2:13-cv-01546-FMO-JC (Tria, Ann-Kathryn) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 09/20 4:03 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Digiliti Money, Inc., identifying Digiliti Money Group, Inc. (Corporate Parent). (Tria, Ann-Kathryn) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 09/20 3:59 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Digiliti Money, Inc. identifying Digiliti Money Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Tria, Ann-Kathryn) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 09/20 3:57 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Digiliti Money, Inc.. (Tria, Ann-Kathryn) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 09/20 3:56 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number BC665904 Receipt No: 0973-20538638 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant Digiliti Money, Inc.. (Attorney Ann-Kathryn Rose Tria added to party Digiliti Money, Inc.(pty:dft))(Tria, Ann-Kathryn) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A -- Copy of Summons and Complaint | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Thu 09/21 4:04 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Digiliti Money, Inc., Does 1 through 10, inclusive, Jeffrey Mack. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Al Blowers. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/21/2017 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT #1] (et) |