U.S. Bank National Association v. Graf
Original Case: 3:17-cv-01185
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-02892 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Case Filed: | Sep 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 26, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 30, 2018 3:29 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellant
Myrna Graf
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee Successor Bank of America, National Association Successor Lasalle Bank National Association
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/30/2018 3:27 AM EST |
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Myrna Graf, FILED. [2128003] 17-2892 [Entered: 09/19/2017 12:12 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 4 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 2 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER RE MOTION TO REMAND, dated 08/29/2017, RECEIVED.[2128012] 17-2892 [Entered: 09/19/2017 12:16 PM] | |
3 | 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2128015] 17-2892 [Entered: 09/19/2017 12:17 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 7 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |