Moultonboro Hospitality LLC
New Hampshire Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Michael A Fagone |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-11326 |
Case Filed: | Sep 21, 2017 |
Dismissed: | Oct 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 01, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
Moultonboro Hospitality LLC
PO Box 366
Moultonborough, NH 03254-0366 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee
1000 Elm Street Suite 605
Manchester, NH 03101 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 22 minutes ago |
Wednesday, November 01, 2017 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Wed 11/01 1:04 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (jtp) |
||
Sunday, October 15, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Mon 10/16 12:45 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 12. Notice Date 10/15/2017. (Admin.) |
|
26 | 26
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Dismissing Case
Mon 10/16 12:45 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Dismissing Case. . No. of Notices: 12. Notice Date 10/15/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Saturday, October 14, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
court
BNC Certificate of Notice (BK)
Sun 10/15 12:47 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/14/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Sat 10/14 12:54 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/13/2017. (Admin.) |
|
23 | 23
court
Notice of Dismissed Case - Order entered
Fri 10/13 2:28 PM
Notice of Entry of Order Dismissing Case. On 10/13/17 an Order Dismissing Debtor was entered. . (jtp) |
|
22 | 22
order
Convert Case to 7
Fri 10/13 2:28 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Case Signed on 10/13/2017. (jtp) |
|
Thursday, October 12, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
court
Clerk Notice of Contingent Dismissal
Thu 10/12 11:03 AM
Notice of Dismissal (Contingent). This case shall be dismissed after November 2, 2017 For Failure to Submit Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing - LBF 5005-4 re: Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Doc. No. 1 unless the missing documents/fees are filed/submitted and/or paid. . Unless Conditions Met, Case to be Dismissed Effective 11/2/2017. (gll) |
|
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Continue/Schedule Hearing
Wed 10/11 4:18 PM
Order to Schedule Hearing Signed on 10/11/2017 Telephonic Hearing scheduled for 10/13/2017 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom 2, 1000 Elm Street, 11th Floor, Manchester, NH. (dcs) |
|
19 | 19
order
Shorten Notice
Wed 10/11 4:17 PM
Order Granting Motion To Shorten Notice Signed on 10/11/2017. (dcs) |
|
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Shorten Notice
Tue 10/10 11:17 AM
Motion to Shorten Notice Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the U.S. Trustee (Karonis, Geraldine) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
17 | 17
motion
Convert Ch 9 or Ch 11 Case to Ch 7 (FEE)
Tue 10/10 11:15 AM
Motion to Dismiss Case for Cause Under 11 U.S.C. Section 1112(b)(4) , Motion to Convert Chapter 11 Case to Chapter 7 . Fee Amount $ 15. Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the U.S. Trustee (Karonis, Geraldine) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Saturday, October 07, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
court
BNC Certificate of Notice (BK)
Sun 10/08 12:47 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/07/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, October 05, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
court
Clerk Notice of Contingent Dismissal
Thu 10/05 8:34 AM
Notice of Dismissal (Contingent). This case shall be dismissed after October 26, 2017 For Failure to File Schedules unless the missing documents/fees are filed/submitted and/or paid. Missing documents: Statement of Financial Affairs, Sch A/B, Sch D, Sch E/F, Sch G, Sch H, Summary of Schedules, Declaration re Debtors Schedules, Aty Disclosure Statement, Verification Statement re List of Creditors, Eq. Sec. Hold List . Unless Conditions Met, Case to be Dismissed Effective 10/26/2017. (jtp) |
|
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 09/29 11:05 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Peter J. Minkow Filed by Creditor Meredith Village Savings Bank (Minkow, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Sunday, September 24, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
court
BNC Certificate of Notice (BK)
Mon 09/25 12:43 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/24/2017. (Admin.) |
|
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate of Notice (BK)
Mon 09/25 12:43 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/24/2017. (Admin.) |
|
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
Mon 09/25 12:43 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors. . No. of Notices: 13. Notice Date 09/24/2017. (Admin.) |
|
10 | 10
court
BNC Certificate of Notice (BK)
Mon 09/25 12:43 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. . No. of Notices: 11. Notice Date 09/24/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Fri 09/22 10:08 AM
Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/25/2017 at 10:00 AM at Room 702, Seventh Floor, 1000 Elm Street, Manchester, NH. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 12/26/2017. Proofs of Claims due by 1/19/2018. (jtp) |
|
6 | 6
order
Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim (CH 11 ONLY)
Fri 09/22 10:06 AM
Order Setting Last Day To File Proofs of Claim Signed on 9/22/2017 Proofs of Claims due by 1/19/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 3/20/2018. (jtp) |
|
5 | 5
court
Case Assigned
Fri 09/22 9:14 AM
Judge Michael A. Fagone assigned to case. (mjc) |
|
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
court
Notice to File Missing Documents (Chapter 11)
Fri 09/22 12:13 PM
Amended Notice to Debtor to File Schedules and Statements. Certain schedules and statements were not filed with the voluntary petition and are required to be filed by the date indicated under Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 1007 and Local Bankruptcy Rule 1007-1. Failure to file the documents required by 11 U.S.C. Section 521(a)(1) and Local Bankruptcy Rule 1007-1 will result in the issuing of a Clerks Notice of Dismissal (Contingent). . Statement of Financial Affairs due by 10/5/2017. Schedule A/B due 10/5/2017. Schedule D due by 10/5/2017. Schedule E/F due 10/5/2017. Schedule G due by 10/5/2017. Schedule H due by 10/5/2017. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 10/5/2017. Declaration re Debtor Schedules due by 10/5/2017. Atty Disclosure Statement due by 10/5/2017. Verified Stmt. re List of Creditors due by 10/5/2017. List of Equity Security Holders due by 10/5/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 10/5/2017. (mjc) |
|
8 | 8
court
Notice to File Missing Documents (Chapter 11)
Fri 09/22 10:15 AM
Notice to Debtor to File Schedules and Statements. Certain schedules and statements were not filed with the voluntary petition and are required to be filed by the date indicated under Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 1007 and Local Bankruptcy Rule 1007-1. Failure to file the documents required by 11 U.S.C. Section 521(a)(1) and Local Bankruptcy Rule 1007-1 will result in the issuing of a Clerks Notice of Dismissal (Contingent). . Statement of Financial Affairs due by 10/5/2017. Schedule A/B due 10/5/2017. Schedule D due by 10/5/2017. Schedule E/F due 10/5/2017. Schedule G due by 10/5/2017. Schedule H due by 10/5/2017. Chapter 11 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income Form 122B Due 10/5/2017. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 10/5/2017. Declaration re Debtor Schedules due by 10/5/2017. Atty Disclosure Statement due by 10/5/2017. Verified Stmt. re List of Creditors due by 10/5/2017. List of Equity Security Holders due by 10/5/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 10/5/2017. (mjc) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Debtor Organizational Documents
Thu 09/21 1:55 PM
Debtor Organizational Documents Filed by Debtor Moultonboro Hospitality LLC (Tamposi, Peter) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Resolution
Thu 09/21 1:54 PM
Corporate Resolution Filed by Debtor Moultonboro Hospitality LLC (Tamposi, Peter) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Thu 09/21 12:48 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-11326 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) filing fee. Receipt number 3319406, Fee amount $1717.00. . (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
9
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) (ACTIVE EVENT)
Thu 09/21 12:47 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Moultonboro Hospitality LLC Chapter 11 Small Business Plan due by 01/19/2018. Disclosure Statement due by 01/19/2018. Statement of Financial Affairs due by 10/5/2017. Schedule A/B due 10/5/2017. Schedule D due by 10/5/2017. Schedule E/F due 10/5/2017. Schedule G due by 10/5/2017. Schedule H due by 10/5/2017. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 10/5/2017. Atty Disclosure Statement due by 10/5/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 10/5/2017. (Tamposi, Peter) |
|
trustee
341 Meeting Date Set - Chapter 11 use ONLY
Thu 09/21 1:28 PM
Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sec. 341(a) the United States Trustee has scheduled the meeting of creditors to take place on 10/25/17 at 10:00 a.m. at the following location: 1000 Elm Street, Suite 702, Manchester, NH 03101. Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the U.S. Trustee (Karonis, Geraldine) |