Verdin v. Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Claire C Cecchi |
Referred: | Leda D Wettre |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-07324 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Sep 21, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 20, 2018 5:14 AM EDT |
Defendant
TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED
|
|
Defendant
TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC
|
|
Defendant
TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC
|
|
Defendant
Takeda Development Center Americas, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Takeda Pharmaceuticals International Inc
|
|
In Re
PROTON-PUMP INHIBITOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (NO.II)
|
|
Notice Only
JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION
CLERK OF THE PANEL ONE COLUMBUS CIRCLE, NE THURGOOD MARSHALL FEDERAL JUDICIARY BUIDLING ROOM G-255 - NORTH LOBBY
WASHINGTON, DC 20002 |
|
Plaintiff
Gail Verdin
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, January 26, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 01/26 12:58 PM
Short Form ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND with Certificate of Service by TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED.(ROSE, BETH) |
|
Tuesday, January 10, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Substitution of Attorney
Tue 01/10 4:09 PM
Substitution of Attorney - Attorney LESLIE A BENITEZ terminated. Attorney BETH S. ROSE for TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC,BETH S. ROSE for TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC,BETH S. ROSE for Takeda Development Center Americas, Inc. added.. (ROSE, BETH) |
|
Thursday, September 30, 2021 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 09/30 4:04 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Magistrate Judge Mark Falk no longer assigned to the case. (wh) |
||
Saturday, September 11, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Substitution of Attorney
Sat 09/11 5:43 PM
Substitution of Attorney - Attorney JEFFREY R. LILLY terminated. Attorney LESLIE A BENITEZ for TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC,LESLIE A BENITEZ for TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC,LESLIE A BENITEZ for Takeda Development Center Americas, Inc. added.. (BENITEZ, LESLIE) |
|
Thursday, May 06, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 05/06 1:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER MAE HOEKSTRA on behalf of Gail Verdin (HOEKSTRA, JENNIFER) |
|
Friday, October 12, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
order
Stipulation and Order
Fri 10/12 10:01 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF NAMED DEFENDANTS ONLY. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 10/11/18. (gh, ) |
|
Wednesday, April 18, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 04/18 12:12 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC, Takeda Development Center Americas, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals International Inc.(LILLY, JEFFREY) |
|
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 09/21 2:33 PM
MDL CASE MANAGMENT ORDER #3. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 9/19/17. (gh, ) |
|
12 | 12
9
pgs
order
Order
Thu 09/21 2:32 PM
MDL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #2. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 8/23/17. (gh, ) |
|
11 | 11
6
pgs
order
Order
Thu 09/21 2:31 PM
MDL INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 8/15/17. (gh, ) |
|
10 | 10
mdl
MDL Notice to Counsel
Thu 09/21 2:23 PM
Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (gh, ) |
|
9 | 9
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Court Transfer
Thu 09/21 12:37 PM
Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:17-cv-06296. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
8 | 8
mdl
MDL Transfer Order (out)
Thu 09/21 11:05 AM
Order of MDL Transfer to District of New Jersey. MDL case number is 2789. Electronic file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent.(jls) |
|
Att: 1 Transmittal Letter | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 09/21 10:52 AM
Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL Panel regarding MDL 2789. (jls) Modified to change date on 9/21/2017 (jls). |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 09/21 2:20 PM
Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Mark Falk added. (gh, ) |
||
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
6 | 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc. on 7/13/2017, answer due 9/11/2017. (Geiger, Andrew) | |
5 | 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Takeda Pharmaceuticals International, Inc. on 7/13/2017, answer due 9/11/2017. (Geiger, Andrew) | |
4 | 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. on 7/13/2017, answer due 9/11/2017. (Geiger, Andrew) | |
3 | 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Takeda Development Center Americas, Inc. on 7/13/2017, answer due 9/11/2017. (Geiger, Andrew) | |
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
2 | 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (jeg) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6234830) filed by Gail Verdin.Attorney Andrew J. Geiger added to party Gail Verdin (pty:pla).(Geiger, Andrew) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/30/2017) (jls). Modified text on 6/30/2017 (jls). | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |