Carlisle v. United Parcel Service, Inc.
Original Case: 7:15-cv-01376
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-02905 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 720 Labor - Labor/Management Relations |
Case Filed: | Sep 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 20, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 22, 2018 4:37 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
United Parcel Service, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Teamsters Local 687, an affiliate of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Robert W. Carlisle
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 08/22/2018 4:34 AM EDT |
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Robert W. Carlisle, FILED. [2129402] 17-2905 [Entered: 09/20/2017 12:09 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 8 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 30+ pgs DISTRICT COURT DECISION AND ORDER, dated 08/29/2017, RECEIVED.[2129413] 17-2905 [Entered: 09/20/2017 12:12 PM] | |
3 | 3 2 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 08/29/2017, RECEIVED.[2129416] 17-2905 [Entered: 09/20/2017 12:12 PM] | |
4 | 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Robert W. Carlisle, district court receipt # 0206-4135949, FILED.[2129422] 17-2905 [Entered: 09/20/2017 12:13 PM] | |
5 | 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2129425] 17-2905 [Entered: 09/20/2017 12:14 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 7 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |