El Omari v. Kreab (USA) Inc.
Original Case: 1:16-cv-03895
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-02901 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Case Filed: | Sep 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 23, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 25, 2018 4:30 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Kreab (USA) Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Ras Al Khiamah Free Trade Zone Authority, A corporation organized under the laws of Ras Al Khiamah, United Arab Emirates, AKA R.A.K. Free Trade Zone Authority, AKA RAKFTZA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Sheikh Saud Bin Saqr Al Qasimi
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
The Arkin Group LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Oussama El Omari, An individual and United States Citizen residing in the State of North Carolina
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 08/25/2018 4:28 AM EDT |
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Oussama El Omari, FILED. [2129079] 17-2901 [Entered: 09/20/2017 10:30 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 15 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 30+ pgs DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 08/17/2017, RECEIVED.[2129083] 17-2901 [Entered: 09/20/2017 10:32 AM] | |
3 | 3 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 08/22/2017, RECEIVED.[2129088] 17-2901 [Entered: 09/20/2017 10:33 AM] | |
4 | 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Oussama El Omari, district court receipt # 0208-14135998, FILED.[2129089] 17-2901 [Entered: 09/20/2017 10:34 AM] | |
6 | 6 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2129093] 17-2901 [Entered: 09/20/2017 10:35 AM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 14 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |