Dooley v. Jetblue Airways Corporation
Original Case: 1:14-cv-04432
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-02899 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Case Filed: | Sep 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 25, 2018 |
Last checked: Thursday Sep 27, 2018 4:32 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Jetblue Airways Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Shari Dooley
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/27/2018 4:29 AM EDT |
Tuesday, September 19, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Shari Dooley, FILED. [2128894] 17-2899 [Entered: 09/20/2017 09:24 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 24 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 13 pgs DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 08/29/2017, RECEIVED.[2128900] 17-2899 [Entered: 09/20/2017 09:26 AM] | |
3 | 3 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 08/30/2017, RECEIVED.[2128903] 17-2899 [Entered: 09/20/2017 09:27 AM] | |
4 | 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Shari Dooley, district court receipt # 0208-14143971, FILED.[2128906] 17-2899 [Entered: 09/20/2017 09:27 AM] | |
5 | 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2128910] 17-2899 [Entered: 09/20/2017 09:28 AM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 9 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |