Isaac v. Ashley Furniture Industries, Inc. et al
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Richard G Stearns |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-11827 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Sep 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 27, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 21, 2018 4:37 AM EDT |
Defendant
Ashley Furniture Industries, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bargain Discount Markets, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Alex Isaac
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Oct 18 2017
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting 9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (RGS, law2) |
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Friday, October 27, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 10/27 3:35 PM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE(Caruso, Stephanie) |
|
Wednesday, October 18, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
6
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Wed 10/18 3:43 PM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (RGS, law2) |
|
Sunday, October 08, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
respm
Opposition to Motion
Sun 10/08 8:18 PM
Opposition re9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Alex Isaac. (Gardner, Joshua) |
|
Wednesday, October 04, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
Wed 10/04 10:57 AM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Rachel A. Straus. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Caruso, Stephanie) |
|
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
Wed 10/04 10:54 AM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Mark D. Campbell. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Caruso, Stephanie) |
|
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
State Court Record - no answer filed in state court
Tue 10/03 11:24 AM
STATE COURT Record. (Lindenbaum, Matthew) |
|
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
9
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Fri 09/29 4:02 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Ashley Furniture Industries, Inc..(Lindenbaum, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Fri 09/29 4:00 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Ashley Furniture Industries, Inc..(Lindenbaum, Matthew) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 09/26 4:28 PM
Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Rachel A. Straus Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6814220 by Ashley Furniture Industries, Inc..(Lindenbaum, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Rachel A. Straus | ||
7 | 7
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 09/26 4:23 PM
Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Mark D. Campbell Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6814198 by Ashley Furniture Industries, Inc..(Lindenbaum, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Mark Campbell | ||
6 | 6
notice
Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel
Tue 09/26 9:14 AM
Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Halley, Taylor) |
|
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff
Mon 09/25 1:43 PM
Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Summons corrected because: Filed incorrectly. Summons should not have been issued in this case. (Halley, Taylor) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Mon 09/25 1:26 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Halley, Taylor) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 09/25 11:26 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Kingston on behalf of Ashley Furniture Industries, Inc. (Kingston, Christine) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 09/22 5:12 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ashley Furniture Industries, Inc.. (Lindenbaum, Matthew) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 09/22 5:03 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ashley Furniture Industries, Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-6809944 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid)(Lindenbaum, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Category Form |