Varela v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Jose E Martinez |
Referred: | Lurana S Snow |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-61853 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:0206 Social Security Benefits |
Case Filed: | Sep 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 26, 2019 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, March 26, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Tue 03/26 4:05 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 3/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz) |
|
25 | 25
2
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Tue 03/26 4:03 PM
ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; denying16 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting19 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying23 Motion for Summary Judgment; Adopting24 Report and Recommendations; All pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. CLOSING CASE. Motions terminated:23 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment with Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Luis Varela,19 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment with Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Commissioner, Social Security Administration,24 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re23 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment with Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Luis Varela,19 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment with Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by C,16 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment with Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Luis Varela. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 3/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz) |
|
Tuesday, March 05, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Report and Recommendations
Tue 03/05 2:50 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Recommending that the Commissioner's Motion for Summary Judgment ECF No.19 be GRANTED, and the Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment ECF Nos.16 ,23 , be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 3/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 3/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (jas) |
|
Monday, February 25, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Summary Judgment
Mon 02/25 3:39 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment with Supporting Memorandum of Law by Luis Varela. Responses due by 3/11/2019 (Goetz, David) |
|
Friday, February 22, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Fri 02/22 2:26 PM
ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to re-file Motion for Summary Judgment. ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the Plaintiff shall, within 7 days from the date of this Order, re-file his Motion for Summary Judgment with citations to the record within the body of the Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 2/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (jas) |
|
Friday, February 15, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Reassignment of AUSA/AFPD
Fri 02/15 5:48 PM
Notice of Reassignment of Assistant U.S. Attorney by Christopher Edward Cheek on behalf of Commissioner, Social Security Administration. Attorney Jessica Elise Elliott terminated.. Attorney Christopher Edward Cheek added to party Commissioner, Social Security Administration(pty:dft). (Cheek, Christopher) |
|
Monday, November 19, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 11/19 3:43 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re16 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment with Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Commissioner, Social Security Administration. Replies due by 11/26/2018. (Elliott, Jessica) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Summary Judgment
Mon 11/19 3:42 PM
Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment with Supporting Memorandum of Law by Commissioner, Social Security Administration. Responses due by 12/3/2018 (Elliott, Jessica) |
|
Wednesday, October 17, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Wed 10/17 11:56 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting17 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 10/17/2018. (bj00) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Extension of Time Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Wed 10/17 11:25 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment re11 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ( Responses due by 10/31/2018), Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to16 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment with Supporting Memorandum of Law by Commissioner, Social Security Administration.(Elliott, Jessica) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, September 18, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Summary Judgment
Tue 09/18 9:32 AM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment with Supporting Memorandum of Law by Luis Varela. Responses due by 10/2/2018 (Goetz, David) |
|
Tuesday, August 21, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Tue 08/21 6:05 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting14 Plaintiff's Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment with Supporting Memorandum of Law. Plaintiff shall file a motion for summary judgment on or before September 22, 2018. Defendant shall file a response to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment and Defendant's motion for summary judgment within thirty (30) days after Plaintiff files his motion for summary judgment. Plaintiff may respond to Defendant's motion for summary judgment and reply to Defendant's response to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment within thirty (30) days after Defendant files her response and motion. Absent exigent circumstances, no further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 8/21/2018. (ean) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time
Tue 08/21 5:32 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time unopposed motion for an additional 30 days to file Motion for Summary Judgment with Memorandum of Law by Luis Varela. Responses due by 9/4/2018 (Goetz, David) |
|
Wednesday, July 18, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Wed 07/18 3:03 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting12 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff shall file a motion for summary judgment on or before August 23, 2018. Defendant shall file a response to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment and Defendant's motion for summary judgment within thirty (30) days after Plaintiff files his motion for summary judgment. Plaintiff may respond to Defendant's motion for summary judgment and reply to Defendant's response to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment within thirty (30) days after Defendant files her response and motion. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 7/18/2018. (ean) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time
Wed 07/18 1:43 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file Motion for Summary Judgment with Supporting Memorandum of Law extension of 30 days by Luis Varela. Responses due by 8/1/2018 (Goetz, David) |
|
Friday, May 25, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 05/25 5:08 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER granting9 Joint Motion for Entry of Proposed Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 5/25/2018. (jas) |
|
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Fri 05/25 4:11 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters, and for a Report and Recommendation on al1 dispositive matters. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 5/25/2018. (jas) |
|
Friday, May 11, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 05/11 3:13 PM
Joint MOTION for Entry of Proposed Scheduling Order by Commissioner, Social Security Administration.(Elliott, Jessica) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Thu 01/18 4:43 PM
Notice and NON-CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge . Filed by Commissioner, Social Security Administration (Elliott, Jessica) |
|
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Transcript - Social Security
Mon 01/08 6:15 PM
Social Security Transcripts filed. Transcripts date: 11/29/17. Pages: 1-1154 Elliott, Jessica) |
|
Att: 1 Transcripts Pages 1126-1154 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 01/08 6:12 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Commissioner, Social Security Administration. Attorney Jessica Elise Elliott added to party Commissioner, Social Security Administration(pty:dft). (Elliott, Jessica) |
|
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Acknowledgment of Service
Wed 11/15 12:27 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE filed by Luis Varela. (Goetz, David) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Fri 09/22 12:26 PM
Summons Issued as to Commissioner, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (jas) |
|
3 | 3
order
Clerks Notice of Docket Correction - ELECTRONIC CASE
Fri 09/22 12:11 PM
Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No venue designated on the Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerks Office confirmed Broward (Office as the county with the filer. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (jas) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Fri 09/22 12:08 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pursuant to the Clerks directive of this cause, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jas) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 09/22 9:59 AM
COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-10051202, filed by Luis Varela.(Goetz, David) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s) U.S. Atty General, | ||
Att: 3 Summon(s) U.S. State Atty's Office (Ft. Lauderdale), | ||
Att: 4 Summon(s) Region IV Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Affidavit Plaintiff's Affidavit and Assignment of Fee |