Diversicare Leasing Corp. et al v. McDavid
Kentucky Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Henry R Wilhoit, Jr |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-00103 |
Nature of Suit | 896 Other Statutes - Arbitration |
Cause | 09:1 U.S. Arbitration Act |
Case Filed: | Sep 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 02, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 21, 2018 5:18 AM EDT |
Executor defendant
Vernon McDavid
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Diversicare Healthcare Services, Inc.,
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Diversicare Leasing Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Diversicare Management Services Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, January 02, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
2
pgs
order
Order Terminate Motions Term Case
Tue 01/02 11:26 AM
ORDER: The wrongful death claims of the Estate of Norma Hall are hereby referred to the Carter Circuit Court, this matter is HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and STRICKEN from the active docket of the Court. The Court will retain jurisdiction over this matter for the purpose of enforcing any arbitration award. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 1/2/18.(KSS)cc: COR Modified on 1/2/2018 to reflect Clerk mailed copy of this Order to Carter Circuit Court Clerk via US Mail this date (KSS) |
|
Friday, December 22, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation
Fri 12/22 1:02 PM
Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation to proceed with arbitration by Diversicare Healthcare Services, Inc.,, Diversicare Leasing Corp., Diversicare Management Services Company. (Murphy, Kevin) |
|
utility
Motion Submitted
Fri 12/22 1:24 PM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Wilhoit for review: re10 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation to proceed with arbitration by Diversicare Healthcare Services, Inc.,, Diversicare Leasing Corp., Diversicare Management Services Company (SMT) |
||
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
respm
Response to Motion
Tue 12/19 2:04 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re7 MOTION to Compel by Diversicare Leasing Corp. filed by Vernon McDavid. (Miller, Robert) |
|
Monday, December 18, 2017 | ||
utility
File Submitted
Mon 12/18 10:23 AM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Wilhoit for review:8 Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (KSS) |
||
Friday, December 15, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Fri 12/15 4:19 PM
JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Sutton, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
utility
Motion Submitted
Wed 11/29 3:53 PM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Wilhoit for review: re7 MOTION to Compel by Diversicare Leasing Corp. (KSS) |
||
Tuesday, November 28, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Compel
Tue 11/28 2:32 PM
MOTION to Compel by Diversicare Leasing Corp.(Murphy, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support MTC Arbitration, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Admission Agreement, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Arbitration Agreement, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Complaint, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit D - Response to Petition, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit E - Diversicare v. Hall, | ||
Att: 7 Errata Exhibit F - Diversicare v. Allen, | ||
Att: 8 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order For Meeting and Report
Mon 11/13 11:52 AM
ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: (1) NLT 11/30/17 counsel for parties shall CONDUCT meeting as required; (2) At time of meeting, counsel for parties shall EXCHANGE disclosures; (3) NLT December 15, 2017, counsel for parties shall FILE a written joint report of the meeting. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 11/13/17.(KSS) |
|
Friday, November 10, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 11/10 6:21 PM
FIRST ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Vernon McDavid.(Miller, Robert) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1
Fri 09/22 4:07 PM
FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Diversicare Healthcare Services, Inc.,, Diversicare Leasing Corp., Diversicare Management Services Company. (SMT) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 09/22 4:06 PM
Summons Issued as to Vernon McDavid; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (SMT) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 09/22 4:04 PM
(PETITION TO ENFORCE) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643.3898663), filed by Diversicare Leasing Corp., Diversicare Management Services Company, Diversicare Healthcare Services, Inc.,.(SMT) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A Arbitration Agreement, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B Carter Circuit Complaint 17-CI-00097, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Agreed Order & Correspondence, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Proposed Order Re Arbitration | ||
misc
Conflict Check
Fri 09/22 4:08 PM
Conflict Check run. (SMT) |