GELIS et al v. BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Cathy L Waldor |
Referred: | Cathy L Waldor |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-07386 |
Nature of Suit | 195 Contract - Contract Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Sep 22, 2017 |
Re-opened: | Oct 06, 2022 |
Terminated: | Mar 24, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 21, 2018 5:07 AM EDT |
Defendant
BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
|
|
Defendant
BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Notice Only
PHV THOMAS P. SOBRAN
|
|
Plaintiff
ARTEM V. GELIS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BHAWAR PATEL
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff Consolidated
ALEX MARTINEZ
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff Consolidated
OLSON V JAMES
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff Consolidated
ROBERT McDONALD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff Consolidated
ASHOK PATEL
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff Consolidated
DAVID RICHARDSON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff Consolidated
DARRIAN STOVALL
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff Consolidated
DEBRA P. WARD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff Consolidated
CHRIS WILLIAMS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff Consolidated
ERIC T. ZINN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff Consolidated
ANDRE MALSKE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff Consolidated
CRAIG LASH
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff Consolidated
SUSAN HEYMAN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff Consolidated
GREGORY HEYMAN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff Consolidated
KAREN HENDERSON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff Consolidated
NICOLE GUY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff Consolidated
AMANDA GOREY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff Consolidated
KENNETH GAGNON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff Consolidated
MICHAEL CERNY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff Consolidated
ERHAN ARAT
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Tuesday, October 03, 2023 | ||
226 | 226
misc
Letter
Tue 10/03 2:43 PM
Letter from Randee Matloff on behalf of class counsel re225 Letter. (MATLOFF, RANDEE) |
|
Friday, September 29, 2023 | ||
225 | 225
misc
Letter
Fri 09/29 11:03 AM
Letter from Christopher Dalton re Status Conference. (DALTON, CHRISTOPHER) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2023 | ||
minutes
Status Conference
Tue 09/26 4:24 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Status Conference held on 9/26/2023. (Court Reporter, ECR) (tjg, ) |