WildEarth Guardians v. Conner, et al
Original Case: 1:15-cv-00858
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-01334 |
Type | civil / usa as party |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Case Filed: | Sep 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 15, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 16, 2019 2:31 AM MDT |
Defendant - Appellee
TAMARA CONNER, in her official capacity as District Ranger, Leadville Ranger District, San Isabel National Forest, United States Forest Service
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
UNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE, a federal agency of the United States Department of Agriculture
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
WILDEARTH GUARDIANS
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Apr 15 2019
[10641113] Affirmed. Terminated on the merits after oral hearing. Written, signed, and published. Judges Hartz(authoring judge), Seymour, and Eid. Mandate to issue. [17-1334] |
Docket last updated: 04/16/2019 2:31 AM MDT |
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
[10499775] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 09/21/2017. Docketing statement due 10/05/2017 for WildEarth Guardians. Transcript order form due 10/05/2017 for WildEarth Guardians. Notice of appearance due on 10/05/2017 for Tamara Conner, United States Forest Service and WildEarth Guardians 17-1334 | ||
Att: 1 39 pgs Main Document | ||
Att: 2 3 pgs General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil |