Robles v. In the Name of Humanity, We Refuse to Accept a Fascist America et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Claudia Wilken |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-04864 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 22, 2017 |
Re-opened: | Aug 05, 2020 |
Terminated: | Aug 20, 2020 |
Last checked: Sunday Feb 18, 2018 1:17 AM PST |
Defendant
City of Berkeley
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
In the Name of Humanity, We Refuse to Accept a Fascist America
|
|
Defendant
Ian Dabney Miller
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Raha Mirabdal
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Regents of the University of California, Berkeley
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
University of California Police Department
|
|
Plaintiff
Kiara Robles
|
Represented By
|
1. | Judge dismisses $23M lawsuit linked to Berkeley protest against Milo Yiannopoulos (berkeleyside.com) |
Submitted Mon 09/17/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 90 minutes ago |
Wednesday, October 21, 2020 | ||
111 | 111
misc
Mail Returned
Mon 10/26 9:20 AM
Mail sent to Kiara Robles returned as undeliverable re110 Order,, Terminated Case,. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) |