Oldapco, Inc.
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Craig T Goldblatt |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-12082 |
Case Filed: | Oct 01, 2017 |
Plan Confirmed: | Aug 14, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1,000-5,000 |
Est. Assets | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Est. Liabilities | $500,000,001 to $1 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Appvion, Inc.
825 E Wisconsin Ave
Appleton, WI 54911-3873 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Oldapco, Inc.
825 East Wisconsin Avenue P.O. Box 359
Appleton, WI 54912 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Friday Jan 18, 2019 12:37 PM EST |
Claims Agent
Prime Clerk LLC
www.primeclerk.com 830 Third Avenue 9th Floor
New York, NY 10022 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ingredion Incorporated
5 Westbrook Corporate Center
Westchester, IL 60154 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
State of Michigan Department of Treasury
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Resolute FP US Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Evonik Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Fair Harbor Capital, LLC
Ansonia Finance Station PO Box 237037
New York, NY 10023 |
|
Creditor
RFI Resources, LLC
White and Williams LLP 600 N. King Street, Suite 800
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
General Electric Capital Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
HYG Financial Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
United States/USAO
U.S. Attorney's Office 1007 N. Orange Street Suite 700
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pennsylvania Electric Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Kane Warehousing, Inc.
Ballard Spahr, LLP 919 N. Market St., 11th Floor
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
KeyBank National Association
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Missouri Department of Revenue
Bankruptcy Unit PO Box 475
Jefferson City, MO 65105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Mitchell Hall of Rehmann Turnaround & Restructuring Services, LLC, Assignee for ESCO COMPANY LLC
2330 East Paris Ave. SE
Grand Rapids, MI 49546 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Penn Pallet, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Oracle America, Inc.
Buchalter, A Professional Corporation c/o Shawn M. Christianson 55 Second Street, 17th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
New Penn Motor Express, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Oak Harbor Freight Lines, Inc.
Ballard Spahr, LLP 919 N. Market St., 11th Floor
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Wise Business Forms, Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
United HealthCare Services, Inc.
One Constitution Plaza
Hartford, CT 06103 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
AIG Insurance Company of Canada
Attn: Adam L. Rosen 489 Fifth Ave., 21st Floor
New York, NY 10017 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
USF Reddaway Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
USF Holland Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
U.S. Bank National Association
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Tri-State Industrial Solutions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ally Bank
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
BTG Americas Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Thiele Kaolin Company
520 Kaolin Road
Sandersville, GA 31082 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Dow Chemical Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
CRG Financial LLC
100 Union Avenue
Cresskill, NJ 07626 |
|
Creditor
Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC 919 North Market St., Ste. 1500
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Checker Logistics, Inc.
231 S. Adams Street
Green Bay, WI 54301 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Chubb Companies
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Department of Revenue
Bureau of Compliance Department 280946
Harrisburg, PA 17128 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Constellation NewEnergy, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Talen Energy Marketing, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
|
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Appvion, Inc., et al.
|
Represented By
|
Fee Examiner
Bayard, P.A.
600 N. King Street Suite 400
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Domtar Paper Company, LLC/Domtar A. W., LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Wilmington Trust, National Association, as DIP Agent
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union ("United Steelworkers")
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
ANDRITZ Paperchine Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
AP Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Ad Hoc Committee of Holders of the 9.000% Second Lien Senior Secured Notes due 2020
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Allstate Insurance Company
|
|
Interested Party
Badger Federal Services, Inc.
|
|
Interested Party
The Reynolds and Reynolds Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Department of Environmental Protection, Office of Chief Counsel
400 Waterfront Drive
Pittsburgh, PA 15222 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Zurich American Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Sun Chemical Corporation
5000 Spring Grove Avenue
Cincinnati, OH 45232 |
|
Interested Party
Eaton Corporation
Global Trade Credit 1000 Eaton Blvd., N3
Cleveland, OH 44122 |
|
Interested Party
Rosebud Mining Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Encapsys, LLC
2515 Eisenhower Dr.
Appleton, WI 54915 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Fifth Third Bank
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Franklin Advisers, Inc., as Investment Manager on Behalf of Certain Funds and Accounts
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
IBM Corporation
|
|
Interested Party
Jefferies Finance, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Moody's Investors Service, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Motus Freight, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Liquidating Trust
The Appvion Liquidating Trust
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Transcriber
EScribers, LLC
Terminated: 10/08/2018
PO Box 7533
New York, NY 10116 |
1. | Fox Valley paper company Appvion files for Chapter 11 bankruptcy protection (fox11online.com) |
Submitted Mon 10/02/2017 | |